Samsung Display Co. LTD. v. Solas Oled LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Samsung Display Co. LTD.
Defendant: Solas Oled LTD. and Neodron LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07201
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 49 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY to Response to Motion re: #47 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip X. Wang dated 10/22/2021. . Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD., Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip X. Wang, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Wang, Philip)
October 22, 2021 Filing 48 REDACTION to #45 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip X. Wang, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15).(Wang, Philip)
October 22, 2021 Filing 47 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip X. Wang dated 10/22/2021. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Wang, Philip)
October 18, 2021 Filing 46 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Philip X. Wang in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and Portions of Supporting Documents addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brett E. Cooper dated September 21, 2021.. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD., Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Replacement Ex. 15)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #11 .(Wang, Philip)
October 15, 2021 Filing 45 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY to Response to Motion re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and Portions of Supporting Documents addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brett E. Cooper dated September 21, 2021. . Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD., Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip Wang, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Wang, Philip)
October 15, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Reza Mirzaie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25195678. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 15, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Neil A. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25195731. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 14, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for Neil A. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25195731. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Neil Rubin, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Rubin, Neil)
October 14, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Reza Mirzaie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25195678. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reza Mirzaie, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Mirzaie, Reza)
October 14, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Marc A. Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25189980. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 14, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for James S. Tsuei to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25190001. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 13, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for James S. Tsuei to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25190001. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Tsuei, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Tsuei, James)
October 13, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Marc A. Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25189980. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Marc Fenster, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fenster, Marc)
October 12, 2021 Filing 40 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of (Exhibit 2 Solas's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (E.D. Tex.) - with Redactions Highlighted) re: #37 Memorandum of Law in Opposition . Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD., Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #36 .(Rudzin, Abby)
October 12, 2021 Filing 39 DECLARATION of (Exhibit 1 Samsung's Response to Solas's Motion for Summary Determination (ITC)) re: #37 Memorandum of Law in Opposition . Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Solas's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (E.D. Tex.) - Redacted).(Rudzin, Abby)
October 12, 2021 Filing 38 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer re: #15 Notice (Other) - with Redactions Highlighted. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD., Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #36 .(Rudzin, Abby)
October 12, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer re: #15 Notice (Other) - Redacted. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(Rudzin, Abby)
October 12, 2021 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Abby F. Rudzin dated October 12, 2021. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(Rudzin, Abby)
October 8, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Donovan McKegney on behalf of Samsung Display Co. LTD...(McKegney, Patrick)
October 5, 2021 Filing 34 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of (Exhibit 1 Samsung's Response to Solas's Motion for Summary Determination (ITC)) re: #33 Declaration . Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD., Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Solas's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (E.D. Tex.))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Rudzin, Abby)
October 5, 2021 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Abby F. Rudzin re: #32 Memorandum of Law in Opposition, (Declaration of Abby F. Rudzin in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer). Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(Rudzin, Abby)
October 5, 2021 Filing 32 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer re: #15 Notice (Other). Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD., Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Rudzin, Abby)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #25 Motion for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #26 Motion for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #27 Motion for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #29 Motion for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #30 Motion for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #24 Motion for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
September 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25129658. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25129658. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Wang, #2 CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Wang, Philip)
September 27, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108994. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #28 MOTION for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25109211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #25 MOTION for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108538. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #29 MOTION for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25109385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108820. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #24 MOTION for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108280. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25109385. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sean Trainor in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Trainor, Daniel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25109211. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Yagura in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 TX Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Yagura, Ryan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108994. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Whilt in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Whilt, Nicholas)
September 24, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108820. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Legum in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Legum, Nathaniel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108538. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Kappos in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kappos, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25108280. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darin Snyder in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Snyder, Darin)
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #22 Letter filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The initial conference scheduled for October 28 is CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/23/2021) (cf)
September 22, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Abby F. Rudzin and Brett E. Cooper dated September 22, 2021 re: Initial Case Conference. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(Rudzin, Abby)
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and Portions of Supporting Documents addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brett E. Cooper dated September 21, 2021. . Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD., Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #19 .(Cooper, Brett)
September 21, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and Portions of Supporting Documents addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brett E. Cooper dated September 21, 2021. . Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brett Cooper, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11).(Cooper, Brett)
September 21, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and Portions of Supporting Documents addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brett E. Cooper dated September 21, 2021. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Cooper, Brett)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 Memo Endorsement,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, #12 Order,, #15 Notice (Other) [Corrected]. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD., Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brett Cooper, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Cooper, Brett)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at October 28, 2021 at 10:50 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. Initial Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/15/2021) (rro)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #18) - ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 Memo Endorsement,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, #15 Notice (Other) . Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD., Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brett Cooper, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #12 .(Cooper, Brett) Modified on 9/17/2021 (ldi).
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of MOTION FOR MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER UNDER THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE 12(b)(6) re: #9 Memo Endorsement,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,. Document filed by Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Cooper, Brett)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Drew Bennett Hollander on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Hollander, Drew)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett E. Cooper on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Cooper, Brett)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GOVERNING THE PROCEDURE TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS FILED IN THIS CASE: ORDERED that the Parties may file documents in this proceeding under seal without further motions to do so, provided that within seven days the party filing a document under seal shall, for each document so filed, publicly file a (i) slip sheet indicating that the document shall be maintained entirely under seal; or (ii) version of the document with only confidential information redacted. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/7/2021) (cf) Modified on 9/10/2021 (cf).
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. Related Document Number: #9 ..(Rudzin, Abby) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #11 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 1/6/2022. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 1/6/2022. The parties shall complete all discovery related to claim construction, including any depositions with respect to claim construction of any witnesses, such as experts identified in the joint claim construction and prehearing statement, as required by Texas Rule 4-4 by 4/8/2022 If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 11/18/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4 days. On 12/9/2021 at 10:40 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. A party wishing to file a summary judgment or other dispositive motion shall file a pre-motion letter at least two weeks before the conference and in the form provided in the Courts Individual Rule III.A.1. Any party wishing to oppose shall file a responsive letter as provided in the same Individual Rule. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. The parties shall appear for a case management conference on 4/14/2022. The party asserting infringement, or the party asserting invalidity if there is no infringement issue present in the case, shall file an opening claim construction brief and all supporting evidence and testimony by 5/16/2022. Opposing party shall file a response by 6/15/2022. The opening party shall file a reply solely rebutting the opposing party's response by 6/22/2022. The parties shall appear for a claim construction hearing on 7/7/2022 at 10:40 a.m. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 2/22/2022. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 10 days. On 3/10/2022 at 10:40 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. A party wishing to file a summary judgment or other dispositive motion shall file a pre-motion letter at least two weeks before the conference and in the form provided in the Courts Individual Rule III.A.1. Any party wishing to oppose shall file a responsive letter as provided in the same Individual Rule. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(a)-(h), 9(j),9(k), 10(b)-(c) and 14(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar. Motions due by 5/16/2022. Responses due by 6/15/2022 Replies due by 6/22/2022. Deposition due by 4/8/2022. Fact Discovery due by 1/6/2022. Expert Discovery due by 2/22/2022. Discovery due by 4/8/2022. Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Claim Construction Hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Telephone Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/2/2021) (cf) Modified on 9/9/2021 (cf).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7 in 1:21-cv-07201-LGS) Letter, filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD., (42 in 1:21-cv-05205-LGS) Letter, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. The parties shall coordinate discovery so that all discovery on common issues or non-confidential issues shall take place jointly. Defendants' motion to consolidate the two actions is DENIED, subject to renewal for trial or some later date. The parties shall file any motion to dismiss or transfer on the following schedule: by September 14, 2021, Defendants shall file any opening brief not to exceed 25 pages; by October 5, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file any opposition brief not to exceed 25 pages; by October 15, 2021, Defendants shall file any reply not to exceed 10 pages. Per the Courts August 26, 2021 order (Dkt. No. 41), the parties are further directed to file a proposed form of Order to address the sealing and redaction of the pleadings, Defendant's motion(s) and any other filings by September 3, 2021. A Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order will issue separately. ( Motions due by 9/14/2021., Responses due by 10/5/2021, Replies due by 10/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/2/2021) (cf) Modified on 9/9/2021 (cf).
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Abby F. Rudzin dated August 31, 2021 re: Scheduling. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Samsung Electronics Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B Samsung Display Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Rudzin, Abby)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Rudzin, Abby)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. for Samsung Display Co. LTD.. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(Rudzin, Abby)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 27, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-05205-LGS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
August 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv5205. Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(pc) (gp).
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) (gp).
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401285120)Document filed by Samsung Display Co. LTD...(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (gp).
August 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neodron LTD...(pc)
August 26, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 21cv5205. (pc)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 21MC685.(pc)
August 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solas Oled LTD...(pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Display Co. LTD. v. Solas Oled LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Display Co. LTD.
Represented By: Abby Faith Rudzin
Represented By: Laura Bayne Gore
Represented By: Shane Hunt
Represented By: Daniel Sean Trainor
Represented By: Nathaniel Legum
Represented By: Nicholas Whilt
Represented By: Darin Walter Snyder
Represented By: John Kappos
Represented By: Patrick Donovan McKegney
Represented By: Ryan Ken Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solas Oled LTD.
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Brett E. Cooper
Represented By: Drew Bennett Hollander
Represented By: James Tsuei
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Neil A. Rubin
Represented By: Philip Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neodron LTD.
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Brett E. Cooper
Represented By: Drew Bennett Hollander
Represented By: James Tsuei
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Neil A. Rubin
Represented By: Philip Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?