Dark et al v. Touro College
Plaintiff: Celina Dark, Travis Berry and Travis Barry
Defendant: Touro College
Case Number: 1:2021cv07355
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the conference will be held telephonically. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the telephone conference: Dial-in: Access code: 888-363-4749 4324948 The parties shall use a landline if one is available. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/27/2021) (kv)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Consented to addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mariah Passarelli dated October 27, 2021., #1 Complaint. Granted. There will be no further extension. Touro College answer due 11/3/2021. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/27/2021) (kv)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Consented to addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mariah Passarelli dated October 27, 2021. Document filed by Touro College..(Passarelli, Mariah)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mariah L. Passarelli dated 09-20-2021., #1 Complaint. Granted. Touro College answer due 10/28/2021. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/21/2021) (tg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Craig Schmidt on behalf of Touro College..(Schmidt, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mariah L. Passarelli dated 09-20-2021. Document filed by Touro College..(Passarelli, Mariah)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariah L Passarelli on behalf of Touro College..(Passarelli, Mariah)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Touro College served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. Service was accepted by Mariah Pasarelli, Esq.. Document filed by Celina Dark; Travis Berry..(Hartzband, Alex)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camilo Malcolm X Burr Di Mauro on behalf of Travis Berry, Celina Dark..(Burr Di Mauro, Camilo)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Touro College. (sj)
September 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Touro College, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Travis Berry, Celina Dark..(Hartzband, Alex)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hartzband, Alex)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Touro College. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25009279)Document filed by Celina Dark, Travis Berry..(Hartzband, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dark et al v. Touro College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celina Dark
Represented By: Alex Jeffrey Hartzband
Represented By: Camilo Malcolm X Burr Di Mauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Berry
Represented By: Alex Jeffrey Hartzband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Barry
Represented By: Camilo Malcolm X Burr Di Mauro
Represented By: Alex Jeffrey Hartzband
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touro College
Represented By: Mariah L Passarelli
Represented By: Michael Craig Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?