Zavala Quezada v. Decker et al.
Petitioner: Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada
Respondent: Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, H. Kevin Mart, Jean King, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas and Tae Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv07375
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: #16 Memorandum of Law in Opposition . Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada..(Pont, Amy)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Petitioner Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada dated 10/06/2021. This request is granted. Petitioner shall file his reply brief by October 13, 2021. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 10/13/2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/7/2021) (jca)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Petitioner Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada dated 10/06/2021. Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada..(Pont, Amy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated September 24, 2021. This request is granted. Petitioner shall file his reply brief by October 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 10/8/2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/28/2021) (jca)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, H. Kevin Mart, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of William D. Morrow in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, H. Kevin Mart, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, H. Kevin Mart, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Repository Inquiry), #2 Exhibit 2 (December 22, 2020 NTA), #3 Exhibit 3 (December 31, 2020 NTA), #4 Exhibit 4 (Notice of Custody Determination), #5 Exhibit 5 (Notice to EOIR: Alien Address), #6 Exhibit 6 (April 2, 2021 Custody Order), #7 Exhibit 7 (May 11, 2021 Decision and Order), #8 Exhibit 8 (April 12, 2021 Oral Decision on Merits), #9 Exhibit 9 (April 12, 2021 Order), #10 Exhibit 10 (Letter to Immigration Judge)).(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated September 24, 2021. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, H. Kevin Mart, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The government may file a brief no longer than 35 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/23/2021) (jca)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated September 20, 2021. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, H. Kevin Mart, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Ann Dona on behalf of Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada..(Dona, Julie)
September 11, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Petitioner Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada dated 09/11/2021 re: Board of Immigration Appeals Bond Decision. Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Board of Immigration Appeals Bond Decision).(Pont, Amy)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada, ENDORSEMENT: The status conference scheduled for September 14, 2021 is adjourned sine die. Government's response to the Petition shall be filed by September 24, 2021. Petitioner's reply shall be filed by October 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/10/2021) Thomas Decker answer due 9/24/2021; Carl DuBois answer due 9/24/2021; Merrick Garland answer due 9/24/2021; Tae Johnson answer due 9/24/2021; Jean King answer due 9/24/2021; H. Kevin Mart answer due 9/24/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 9/24/2021.( Replies due by 10/6/2021.) (ks)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Petitioner Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada dated 09/10/2021 re: Court Order (ECF No. 4). Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada..(Pont, Amy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica F. Rosenbaum on behalf of Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, H. Kevin Mart, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Accompanying Papers, and Court Order served on Thomas DECKER et al. on 09/03/2021. Service was accepted by Assistant U.S. Attorney Brandon Waterman. Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada..(Pont, Amy)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On September 1, 2021, Petitioner Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada petitioned the Court for the writ of habeas corpus. Dkt. 1. Counsel for all parties shall appear for a teleconference with the Court on September 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Counsel should confer in advance of the conference and submit a joint letter, no later than two business days prior to the conference, indicating whether the conference is necessary and addressing how the Court should handle the present Petition. If counsel do not believe a conference is required, and that briefing is appropriate, counsel should propose a briefing schedule (expedited or otherwise) in the joint letter. Within two business days of this Order, Petitioner's counsel is directed (1) to serve Respondents with a copy of the petition and accompanying papers, along with a copy of this Order, by overnight mail, and (2) to promptly file proof of such service on the docket. Counsel for Respondents shall promptly enter notices of appearance. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/20/2021) (jca)
September 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Amy Pont. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada, Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, H. Kevin Mart, Jean King, Merrick Garland, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Tae Johnson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Alberto Casadevall in Support re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E).(Pont, Amy)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pont, Amy)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25012396)Document filed by Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada..(Pont, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala Quezada v. Decker et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Efrain Zavala Quezada
Represented By: Amy Pont
Represented By: Julie Ann Dona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl DuBois
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. Kevin Mart
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean King
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tae Johnson
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?