Zioness Movement, Inc. v. The Lawfare Project, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zioness Movement, Inc.
Defendant: The Lawfare Project, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07429
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The extension request and proposed briefing schedule are approved, with one change: any Reply will be due January 10, 2022. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/27/2021) (vfr)
October 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Lawfare Project, Inc. answer due 11/11/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2021. Motions due by 11/11/2021. Responses due by 12/20/2021 Replies due by 1/10/2022. (vfr)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Matthew Trokenheim dated October 26, 2021. Document filed by The Lawfare Project, Inc...(Trokenheim, Matthew)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys for Plaintiff Zioness Movement, Inc. (Plaintiff) and Defendant The Lawfare Project, Inc. (Defendant) that the time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint filed on September 3, 2021 (ECF No. 1) is hereby extended by 30 days from September 28, 2021 to October 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. (The Lawfare Project, Inc. answer due 10/28/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/29/21) (yv)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Anthony Siem on behalf of The Lawfare Project, Inc...(Siem, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Lawfare Project, Inc...(Trokenheim, Matthew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Scott Trokenheim on behalf of The Lawfare Project, Inc...(Trokenheim, Matthew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Maloney on behalf of Zioness Movement, Inc...(Maloney, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Lawfare Project, Inc. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. Service was accepted by Douglas Wyatt. Document filed by Zioness Movement, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Email confirmation).(Felicello, Rosanne)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Lawfare Project, Inc...(jgo)
September 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rosanne Elena Felicello. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Administrative Subpoena; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Felicello, Rosanne)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Zioness Movement, Inc...(Felicello, Rosanne)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Felicello, Rosanne)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Lawfare Project, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Zioness Movement, Inc...(Felicello, Rosanne)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lawfare Project, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25021325)Document filed by Zioness Movement, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Trademark).(Felicello, Rosanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zioness Movement, Inc. v. The Lawfare Project, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zioness Movement, Inc.
Represented By: Rosanne Elena Felicello
Represented By: Michael James Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lawfare Project, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Trokenheim
Represented By: Michael Anthony Siem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?