Antipova v. CareMount Medical P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and Yelena Antipova
Defendant: CareMount Medical P.C., Weill Cornell Medicine, New York-Presbyterian / Weill Cornell Medical Center, Edward S. Barnes, Margaret M. Polaneczky and Ann D. Carlson
Case Number: 1:2021cv07453
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Yelena Antipova 174 Grand Street Apt. 2A Jersey City, NJ 07302, at, on 10/15/2021 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 6 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ann D. Carlson. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Margaret M. Polaneczky. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward S. Barnes. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York-Presbyterian / Weill Cornell Medical Center. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Weill Cornell Medicine. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CareMount Medical P.C. (aan)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants CareMount Medical P.C.; Weill Cornell Medicine; New York Presbyterian/Weill Cornell Medical Center; Edward S. Barnes, MD; Margaret M. Polaneczky, MD; and Ann D. Carlson. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. Because Plaintiff has consented to proceeding with this action under her real name, see ECF 5, the Clerk of Court is directed to substitute "Yelena Antipova" for "Jane Doe" in the caption of this case. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 3.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/15/2021) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Yenena Antipova (Jane Doe) re: #4 Order on Motion for Confidentiality. Document filed by Jane Doe. (sc)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Confidentiality. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to proceed anonymously. (ECF 1.) Within fifteen days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must notify the Court whether she wishes to withdraw the complaint or whether she intends to proceed under her real name. If Plaintiff fails to respond within fifteen days, the action will proceed with Plaintiff's real name in the caption. For Plaintiff's convenience, a declaration form is attached to this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 3.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/27/2021) (sac)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Jane Doe consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Jane Doe.(sc)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402 Check processed by the Finance Department on 9/23/2021, Receipt Number 465401286457. (smc)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Edward S. Barnes, CareMount Medical P.C., Ann D. Carlson, New York-Presbyterian / Weill Cornell Medical Center, Margaret M. Polaneczky, Weill Cornell Medicine. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Complaint) (sac)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Confidentiality to file as Jane Doe. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion to file as Jane Doe) (sac)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antipova v. CareMount Medical P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelena Antipova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareMount Medical P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weill Cornell Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian / Weill Cornell Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret M. Polaneczky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann D. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?