Vallair Solutions SARL v. 321 Precision Conversions LLC
Plaintiff: Vallair Solutions SARL
Defendant: 321 Precision Conversions LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv07507
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/14/2021) (ks)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Kenneth Scott Nankin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/5/2021) (kv)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 321 Precision Conversions LLC waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. Document filed by Vallair Solutions SARL..(Nankin, Kenneth)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to Defendant 321 Precision Conversions LLC c/o Seth J. Linnick, Esq.. Document filed by Vallair Solutions SARL. Request for Waiver Mailed on 9/21/2021. Waiver of Service due by 10/21/2021..(Nankin, Kenneth)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 321 Precision Conversions LLC. (vf)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Kenneth Scott Nankin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth S Nankin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 75,001,000; County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 75,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (vf)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Kenneth Scott Nankin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034289. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Vallair Solutions SARL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Nankin, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 321 Precision Conversions LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Vallair Solutions SARL..(Nankin, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vallair Capital SAS for Vallair Solutions SARL. Document filed by Vallair Solutions SARL..(Nankin, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nankin, Kenneth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 321 Precision Conversions LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25033618)Document filed by Vallair Solutions SARL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Conversion Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Conformity Agreement).(Nankin, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallair Solutions SARL v. 321 Precision Conversions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vallair Solutions SARL
Represented By: Kenneth S Nankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 321 Precision Conversions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?