A & J Produce Corp. et al v. Valentine Produce Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc., S. Katzman Produce Inc. and D'Arrigo Bros. Co. of New York, Inc.,
Defendant: Diane Reilly, Valentine Produce Inc., John E. Reilly and Debbie Reilly
Case Number: 1:2021cv07531
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Diane Reilly, John E. Reilly, Valentine Produce Inc.. Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., S. Katzman Produce Inc., Coosemans New York Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Brown, Gregory)
September 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Adam Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the PDF case caption must list all of the parties listed on the pleading. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Adam Brown to RE-FILE re: Document No. #12 Second Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF case caption contains a terminated party; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party D'Arrigo Bros. Co. of New York, Inc. as a new party; Court's leave has not been granted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Second Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by D'Arrigo Bros. Co. of New York, Inc.,..(Brown, Gregory)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint, against Diane Reilly, John E. Reilly, Valentine Produce Inc..Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., S. Katzman Produce Inc., Coosemans New York Inc., D'Arrigo Bros. Co. of New York, Inc.,. Related document: #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint,..(Brown, Gregory) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jgo).
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to John E. Reilly, re: #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc., S. Katzman Produce Inc...(Brown, Gregory) Modified on 9/24/2021 (jgo).
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by S. Katzman Produce Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Diane Reilly, John E. Reilly, Valentine Produce Inc..Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc., S. Katzman Produce Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Brown, Gregory)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Valentine Produce Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Designated Agent for the New York Secretary of State. Service was made by additional mailing. Document filed by A & J Produce Corp.; Coosemans New York Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice Pursuant to NY Business Corporation Law 306).(Brown, Gregory)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diane Reilly, John E. Reilly..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Valentine Produce Inc...(pc)
September 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John E. Reilly and Diane Reilly a/k/a Debbie Reilly, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Valentine Produce Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc...(Brown, Gregory)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Gregory)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diane Reilly, John E. Reilly, Valentine Produce Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25036543)Document filed by A & J Produce Corp., Coosemans New York Inc...(Brown, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A & J Produce Corp. et al v. Valentine Produce Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentine Produce Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & J Produce Corp.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coosemans New York Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Katzman Produce Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Arrigo Bros. Co. of New York, Inc.,
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?