Robbins v. Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Robbins
Defendant: Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv07536
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSED CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY on re: #8 Proposed Consent Order filed by Gregory Robbins. ENDORSEMENT: The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and SO ORDERED. Attorney Gary Allan Gardner for Gregory Robbins added. Attorney John Paton James terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/14/2021) (vfr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Gregory Robbins..(Gardner, Gary)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC..(Canevari, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kirby Corporation, Other Affiliate Kirby Offshore Marine, LLC for Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC. Document filed by Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC..(Canevari, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/17/2021) (vfr)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gregory Robbins..(James, John)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, John)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC. Document filed by Gregory Robbins..(James, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Robbins
Represented By: John Paton James
Represented By: Gary Allan Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Mark Canevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?