Zhou v. Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP et al
Plaintiff: Jingling Zhou
Defendant: Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP, Yaofei Chen, Hyejin Lee and Chen Li
Case Number: 1:2021cv07576
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Yaofei Chen, Hyejin Lee, Chen Li, Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP. Document filed by Jingling Zhou. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Jingling Zhou. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Musumeci, Sandra) Modified on 9/17/2021 (dt).
September 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Musumeci, Sandra. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against (select names, not All Defendant)- and attach the correct signed PDF. (dt)
September 11, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Sandra L. Musumeci in Support re: #8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. Document filed by Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Upon the declaration of Jingjing Zhou, sworn to the day of September 10, 2021, and upon the copy of the complaint in the above-captioned matter, it is ORDERED, that the above-named defendants show cause before a motion term of this Court, at Room 11D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, in the City, County and State of New York, on September 22, 2021, at 4:30 o'clock in the afternoon thereof, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining the defendants during the pendency of this action from: (i) diluting Ms. Zhou's ownership percentage of Youbi Capital; (ii) distributing profits from Youbi Capital (Cayman) Series 2 LP; (iii) distributing payments of proceeds to any investors and collecting carried interest for all limited partnerships in which Youbi Capital has an interest and manages as a general partner; and (iv) selling, assigning, or dissipating cryptocurrency and non-cryptocurrency assets whether held by Youbi Capital itself or held by Youbi Capital as General Partner of any other limited partnership; and it is further ORDERED that personal service of a copy of this order and annexed affidavit upon the defendants or their counsel on or before 5 o'clock in the afternoon, September 13, 2021, shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof. Answering papers shall be due September 20, 2021 on or before 5 o'clock in the afternoon. So Ordered. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/22/2021 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/10/2021) (js)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yaofei Chen..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chen Li..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hyejin Lee..(pc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . . Document filed by Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Jingling Zhou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jingjing Zhou in Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order).(Musumeci, Sandra) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Lynn Musumeci on behalf of Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chen Li, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hyejin Lee, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yaofei Chen, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jingling Zhou..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yaofei Chen, Hyejin Lee, Chen Li, Youbi Capital(Cayment) GP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25044627)Document filed by Jingling Zhou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Musumeci, Sandra)
September 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sandra Lynn Musumeci. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Youbi Capital(Cayment) GP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
September 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sandra Lynn Musumeci. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $20,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhou v. Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingling Zhou
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Musumeci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youbi Capital (Cayman) GP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaofei Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyejin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?