DeMarco v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Demarco and Gerard P. DeMarco
Defendant: . Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07662
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Zimmer US, Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Zimmer, Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. Service was made by E-mail. Document filed by Gerard P. DeMarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 16, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc...(gp)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc...(gp)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc...(gp)
September 16, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
September 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
September 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerard P. DeMarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerard P. DeMarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerard P. DeMarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Anapol, Thomas) Modified on 9/15/2021 (sj).
September 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas R. Anapol to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; There must be two pages filed; Plaintiff's name must match exactly as pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
September 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas R. Anapol to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; Filer's name must match exactly as pleading in docket entry and on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas R. Anapol. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 8 (Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
September 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas R. Anapol. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gerard P. DeMarco, Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
September 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas R. Anapol to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; The civil cover sheet is two pages. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
September 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18md2859. (sj)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald Demarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald Demarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald Demarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859(PAC) / 18-MC-2859 (PAC). Document filed by Gerald Demarco..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Anapol, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US Inc.,. Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25058537)Document filed by Gerald Demarco..(Anapol, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMarco v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Demarco
Represented By: Thomas R. Anapol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard P. DeMarco
Represented By: Thomas R. Anapol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?