Patterson v. Breaux
Plaintiff: William Patterson
Defendant: Christopher Breaux
Case Number: 1:2021cv07851
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to William Patterson 267 West 152nd Street Apt. 4E New York, NY 10039, at, on 10/19/2021 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 1 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (aan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Breaux. (aan) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/19/2021) (aan).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons as to Defendant Christopher Breaux, P/K/A Frank Ocean. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendant or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. SO ORDERED. USM-285 Form due by 11/17/2021. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 11/17/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/18/21) (yv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 15, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
October 15, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 09/24/2021, Receipt Number 465401286633. (bwi)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 11/12/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 11/12/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/12/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP application) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 12, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to William Patterson at 267 West 152nd Street, Apt. 4E, New York, NY 10039. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement IFP application) (dsh)
October 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Breaux, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Patterson. (sac)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Breaux. Document filed by William Patterson. (sac)
September 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?