Jean-Baptiste v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Harold Jean-Baptiste
Defendant: City of New York, Mayor Bill De Blasio and Dermot F. Shea
Case Number: 1:2021cv07876
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: denying without prejudice #15 Motion re: #15 MOTION for Access CM/ECF User Name and Password. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 15. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/18/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion Form) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 18, 2021 Mailed a copy of #16 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Harold Jean-Baptiste at 253-37 148 Drive, Rosedale, NY 11422. (kh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Access CM/ECF User Name and Password. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste.(rdz)
November 15, 2021 Mailed a copy of #14 Memo Endorsement, #10 Summons Issued to Harold Jean-Baptiste at 253-37 148 Drive, Rosedale, NY 11422. (dsh)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter, filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to update Plaintiff's address to 253-37 148 Drive Rosedale NY 11422 and to mail the summonses to his updated address. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/12/2021) (ate) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 (2nd)AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #4 Amended Complaint against City of New York, City of New York(Attn. Corp. Counsel) , Bill De Blasio, Dermot F. Shea.Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint.(sc) Modified on 11/10/2021 (sc).
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER from Harold Jean-Baptiste, dated 11/9/21 re: I want to apologize to the U.S. Court for the Southern District of New York, because I placed my Florida address on the Complaint instead of my New York address. Please change my address to the New York address: 253-37 148 Drive, Rosedale, NY 11422; and please mail the summons to the new address stated on this letter. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste.(sc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal at a later date #9 Motion for a CM/ECF User Name and Password re: #9 MOTION FOR CM/ECF USE NAME & PASSWORD. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password. ECF No. 9. Plaintiff's Motion is lacking certain assurances such as, for example, whether Plaintiff reviewed and agrees to the Court's Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. Plaintiff is therefore directed to review, complete, and submit for filing the Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing form provided by the Clerk of Court, or to submit an affirmation containing the information included in the form motion. The form motion is attached to this Order and is also available at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2019-04/2012-prosemotionecffiling-final.pdf. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/4/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing form) (ate) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 4, 2021 Mailed a copy of #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Harold Jean-Baptiste at 1605 NE 141st Street, North Miami, FL 33181. (kh)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, Mayor Bill De Blasio, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea. (sha)
November 1, 2021 Mailed a copy of #10 Summons Issued to Harold Jean-Baptiste at 1605 NE 141st Street, North Miami, FL 33181. (sha)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION: "FOR CM/ECF USE NAME & PASSWORD." Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste.(sc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste. (sc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayor Bill De Blasio, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste. (sc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste. (sc)
October 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
October 26, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
October 26, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
October 26, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
October 26, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY & INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, re: amending #2 Complaint against City of New York, City of New York, Bill De Blasio, Dermot F. Shea.Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste. Related document: #2 Complaint.(sc)
October 8, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 10/08/2021, Receipt Number 465401287276. (bwi)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES BY CERTIFIED CHECK, BANK CHECK, OR MONEY ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees by certified check, bank check, or money order, payable to: Clerk of Court SDNY, and can be mailed to: Cashiers Unit Room 260, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Any certified check, bank check, or money order must include Plaintiffs case number, 21-CV-7876 (LTS). Payment must be made within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 11/5/2021. Amended In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 11/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/6/2021) (Attachments: #1 Amended IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
October 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 6, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Harold Jean-Baptiste at 253-37 148 Drive, Rosedale, NY 11422. (kh)
October 5, 2021 Deficient Pro Se Payment of Fee Received: Incorrect Payment Type received by the Finance Department on 10/04/2021, in the amount of $402.00. Payment will be held by the Finance Office pending further order of the Court. (bwi)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against City of New York, City of New York, Bill De Blasio, Dermot F. Shea. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste..(rdz)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Harold Jean-Baptiste..(rdz)
September 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean-Baptiste v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Jean-Baptiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill De Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermot F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?