Cine Graphic Solutions LLC v. FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation et al.
Plaintiff: Cine Graphic Solutions LLC
Defendant: FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Fujifilm North America Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv07917
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard F. Martinelli dated 11/18/2021., #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation answer due 12/20/2021; Fujifilm North America Corporation answer due 12/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/19/2021) (kv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard F. Martinelli dated 11/18/2021. Document filed by FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation..(Martinelli, Richard)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard F. Martinelli dated 10/15/2021., #1 Complaint,. Application Granted. So Ordered. (FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation answer due 11/19/2021; Fujifilm North America Corporation answer due 11/19/20210.)(Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/18/21) (yv)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard F. Martinelli dated 10/15/2021. Document filed by FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation..(Martinelli, Richard)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard F Martinelli on behalf of FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation..(Martinelli, Richard)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Fujifilm North America Corporation served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company Registered Agent. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC..(Ginnings, Charles)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. Service was accepted by Lyanne Gares. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fujifilm North America Corporation. (sj)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fujifilm North America Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation. (sj)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fujifilm Holdings America Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles Austin Ginnings to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
September 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25097747. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Charles Austin Ginnings to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Each summons must be filed separately. Or you can use one summons form and list each party on a separate rider.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles Austin Ginnings. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fujifilm North America Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles Austin Ginnings. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25097747. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Grochocinski, Timothy)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FujiFilm Holdings America Corporation and FujiFilm North America Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional Summons).(Ginnings, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Ginnings, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation, Fujifilm North America Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25096429)Document filed by Cine Graphic Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- '587 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2- '977 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3- '644 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4- 587 Chart, #5 Exhibit 5- 977 Chart, #6 Exhibit 6- 644 Chart).(Ginnings, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cine Graphic Solutions LLC v. FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cine Graphic Solutions LLC
Represented By: Timothy E Grochocinski
Represented By: Charles Austin Ginnings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUJIFILM Holdings America Corporation
Represented By: Richard F Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Fujifilm North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?