Demopoulos et al v. Rollin Dairy Corp.
Plaintiff: Demos P. Demopoulos, Michael Spinelli, Lawrence Cuomo and Robert Patrizio
Defendant: Rollin Dairy Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07923
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Accordingly, if Plaintiffs intend to seek a default judgment they are directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than December 1, 2021. If Plaintiffs fail to do so or otherwise demonstrate that they intend to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/17/2021) (ate)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Rollin Dairy Corp. served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Robert Patrizio; Demos P. Demopoulos; Lawrence Cuomo; Michael Spinelli..(Treiman, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rollin Dairy Corp...(pc)
September 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rollin Dairy Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Cuomo, Demos P. Demopoulos, Robert Patrizio, Michael Spinelli..(Treiman, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lawrence Cuomo, Demos P. Demopoulos, Robert Patrizio, Michael Spinelli..(Treiman, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Treiman, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rollin Dairy Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25097805)Document filed by Robert Patrizio, Demos P. Demopoulos, Lawrence Cuomo, Michael Spinelli..(Treiman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demopoulos et al v. Rollin Dairy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demos P. Demopoulos
Represented By: Daniel Treiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spinelli
Represented By: Daniel Treiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Cuomo
Represented By: Daniel Treiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Patrizio
Represented By: Daniel Treiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollin Dairy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?