Gonzalez et al v. Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Ilonka Gonzalez and Juan Gonzalez, Jr.
Defendant: Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv07941
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memo Endorsed Order (ECF No. 16) and Memo Endorsed Order (ECF No. 17) served on Ilonka Gonzalez and Juan Gonzalez Jr. on 11/19/2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service..(Farber, David)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service. ENDORSEMENT: The motion to withdraw is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Gokce T. Yurekli, counsel for Defendant, from this case. Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiffs and file proof of service on ECF on or before November 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. Attorney Gokce T. Yurekli terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/19/2021) (mml)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 10/4/21., #1 Complaint. To the extent this extension request remains a live issue after Defendant has already filed an answer on November 17, 2021, the request is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The Clerk of Court is requested to terminate the letter motion at ECF No. 11. Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Memo Endorsement on Plaintiffs and file proof of service on ECF on or before November 22, 2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/19/2021) (rro)
November 18, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer (ECF No. 13) and Letter (ECF No. 14) served on Ilonka Gonzalez and Juan Gonzalez Jr. on 11/17/2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service..(Farber, David)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from David E. Farber dated 11/17/2021 re: requesting removal of Gokce T. Yurekli from this matter. Document filed by Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service..(Farber, David)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service..(Farber, David)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Eli Farber on behalf of Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service..(Farber, David)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 10/4/21. Document filed by Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service..(Barnea, Jean-David)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:21-cv-02272. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
September 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
September 23, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MOTION (ECF DOC. NO. #7 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: THE UNITED STATES MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION IS DENIED; THE UNITED STATES ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE DISTRICT IN WHICH THE TAXPAYERS RESIDE IS GRANTED REQUIRING THE CLERK OF COURT FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK; AND, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/22/21. 9/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/22/21. 9/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Change Venue filed by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(YUREKLI, GOKCE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by TRAVIS STACKHOUSE re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE by PERSONAL SERVICE. (SERVICE ACCEPTED BY PERNELL PENNY) (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, with Acceptance of Service. Emailed To: AUSA & Pro Se Plaintiffs on 7/2/21. (va, ) Modified on 7/2/2021 (va, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. Emailed To: Plaintiffs on 7/2/21. (va, ) (FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED WITH CORRECT EVENT.) Modified on 7/2/2021 (va, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/30/21. 7/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE229123 (sbt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF PLAINTIFFS SEEK TO PROCEED THEY MUST, NO LATER THAN JUNE 28, 2021, EITHER (1) PAY $402 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) MOVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFFS WITH TWO (2) APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 5/27/21. 5/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
May 27, 2021 IFP FORM E-MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS ON 5/27/21. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, filed by ILONKA GONZALEZ, JUAN GONZALEZ, JR. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 E-MAIL)(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilonka Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Gonzalez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of The Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Gokce T. Yurekli
Represented By: David E. Farber
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?