Spillane et al v. New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Brendan Spillane, Debra Spillane and Deborah Spillane
Defendant: New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Eddie McWilliams and New York City District Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund
Trustee: Joseph A. Geiger
Case Number: 1:2021cv08016
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The parties' deadline to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan is ADJOURNED to December 6, 2021. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2021) (kv)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time from Union Defendants Regarding Plaintiffs Filing an Amended Complaint and Adjourning Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from James M. Murphy dated 11/19/21. Document filed by Eddie McWilliams, New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America..(Murphy, James)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marty Gerard Glennon on behalf of Joseph A. Geiger, New York City District Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund..(Glennon, Marty)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Paul K. Brown dated November 19, 2021 re: Second Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Joseph A. Geiger, New York City District Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund..(Brown, Paul)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gillian Costello on behalf of Eddie McWilliams, New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America..(Costello, Gillian)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M Murphy on behalf of Eddie McWilliams, New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America..(Murphy, James)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Kevin Brown on behalf of Joseph A. Geiger, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund..(Brown, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2021) (kv)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by November 26, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2021) (kv)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/25/2021) (kv)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 90-cv-05722 and declined by Judge Victor Marrero and returned to wheel for assignment. (aea)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Robert K Erlanger re: that this action be filed as related to 90-civ-5722. Document filed by Debra Spillane, Patrick Brendan Spillane..(Erlanger, Robert)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (aea)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert K Erlanger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 791 (Labor: E.R.I.S.A.);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 890 (Other Statutory Actions);. (pc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert K Erlanger re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert K Erlanger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joseph A. Geiger, Debra Spillane. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Robert K Erlanger, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Victor Marrero as possibly related to 90cv5722. (pc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Erlanger, Robert)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph A. Geiger, Eddie McWilliams, New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25115368)Document filed by Patrick Brendan Spillane, Debra Spillane..(Erlanger, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spillane et al v. New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Brendan Spillane
Represented By: Robert K Erlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Spillane
Represented By: Robert K Erlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Spillane
Represented By: Robert K Erlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City District Council of Carpenters and Joiners of America
Represented By: Gillian Costello
Represented By: James M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Paul Kevin Brown
Represented By: Marty Gerard Glennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City District Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund
Represented By: Paul Kevin Brown
Represented By: Marty Gerard Glennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie McWilliams
Represented By: Gillian Costello
Represented By: James M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City District Council of Carpenters Annuity Fund
Represented By: Paul Kevin Brown
Represented By: Marty Gerard Glennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Joseph A. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?