Calcano-King v. Goulette et al
Plaintiff: Lilian Calcano-King
Defendant: Gary Michael Goulette and Fedex Custom Critical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08059
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 tm
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Order dated November 22, 2021. Document filed by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc., Gary Michael Goulette..(Dargan, Thomas)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, Bronx County, on October 1, 2021. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than December 2, 2021. Counsel for the defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by November 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/22/2021) (rro)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Debra Klotz on behalf of Fedex Custom Critical, Inc., Gary Michael Goulette..(Klotz, Jessica)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dargan, Thomas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dargan, Thomas) Modified on 10/4/2021 (pc).
October 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas J. Dargan to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple citizenships for the defendant were selected. Choose one for the first listed defendant. (pc)
October 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas J. Dargan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): citizenship for the defendant was not selected. (pc)
October 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas J. Dargan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Custom Critical, Inc.. Document filed by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc., Gary Michael Goulette..(Dargan, Thomas)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dargan, Thomas) Modified on 10/4/2021 (pc).
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 808299/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25142054).Document filed by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc., Gary Michael Goulette..(Dargan, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam H. Silverstone on behalf of Fedex Custom Critical, Inc., Gary Michael Goulette..(Silverstone, Adam)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas J. Dargan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas J. Dargan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas J. Dargan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code 7 (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code 7 (NONE); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas J. Dargan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): File the Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement under Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under Other Filings, Other Documents. File the Notice of Appearance under Other Filings, Notices. (pc)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Thomas J. Dargan. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 10/4/2021..(pc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 808299/2021..Document filed by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc., Gary Michael Goulette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Fedex Custom Critical, Inc).(Dargan, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calcano-King v. Goulette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilian Calcano-King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Michael Goulette
Represented By: Thomas J. Dargan
Represented By: Adam H. Silverstone
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Custom Critical, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Dargan
Represented By: Adam H. Silverstone
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?