Wang v. Skype Communications S.a.r.l et al
Plaintiff: Hao Zhe Wang
Defendant: Skype Communications S.a.r.l and Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv08082
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Registered Agent wearing a baseball cap. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sac)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Skype Communications S.a.r.l served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Service was accepted by Registered Agent wearing a baseball cap. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sac)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Skype Communications S.a.r.l. (aan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microsoft Corporation. (aan)
October 21, 2021 Mailed a copy of #10 Summons Issued, #11 Summons Issued to Hao Zhe Wang P.O. Box 7075 New York, NY 10150. (aan)
October 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
October 21, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Skype Communications S.a.r.l., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microsoft Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (sc)
October 20, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
October 20, 2021 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
October 20, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402 Check processed by the Finance Department on 10/19/2021, Receipt Number 465401287807. (smc)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO SEAL. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang.(sc)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION of Hao Z. Wang IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE, re: #5 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang.(sc)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRAL AWARD. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit).(sc) Modified on 10/12/2021 (sc).
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hao Zhe Wang. (rdz)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Hao Zhe Wang consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang..(rdz)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (rdz)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a.r.l. Document filed by Hao Zhe Wang.(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2021: #1 Exhibit) (rdz).
September 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Skype Communications S.a.r.l et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hao Zhe Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skype Communications S.a.r.l
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?