Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust v. Charles Schwab & Co. Inc
Petitioner: EVAN K. HALPERIN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Respondent: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv08098
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #9 Letter filed by Charles Schwab & Co. ENDORSEMENT: The Proposed briefing schedule is adopted. SO ORDERED., ( Cross Motions due by 12/17/2021., Responses due by 1/7/2022, Replies due by 1/21/2022.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/22/2021) (ama)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND TERMINATE CM/ECF NOTICES: granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Clifford Eric Schwartz terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/22/2021) (ama)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew J. Melnick dated 11/22/2021 re: Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc..(Melnick, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gaurav K Talwar on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co. Inc..(Talwar, Gaurav)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Melnick on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co. Inc..(Melnick, Andrew)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Clifford Schwartz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion to Withdraw, #2 Affidavit Declaration, #3 Supplement Memo of Law, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Schwartz, Clifford)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Barry F. Furman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Barry F. Furman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25173472. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Barry F. Furman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25173472. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust..(Furman, Barry)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION..Document filed by Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust..(Schwartz, Clifford)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION..Document filed by Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust..(Schwartz, Clifford)
September 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Clifford Eric Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error, the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
September 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Clifford Eric Schwartz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
September 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Clifford Eric Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: EVAN K. HALPERIN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
September 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25129428).Document filed by Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Letter to the Court).(Schwartz, Clifford) Modified on 9/30/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evan K. Halperin Revocable Living Trust v. Charles Schwab & Co. Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EVAN K. HALPERIN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Clifford Eric Schwartz
Represented By: Barry A. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc
Represented By: Andrew J. Melnick
Represented By: Gaurav K Talwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?