DBW Investments, LLC et al v. Vnue, Inc.
Plaintiff: DBW Investments, LLC and GOLOCK Capital, LLC
Defendant: Vnue, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08103
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Gretschel on behalf of Vnue, Inc...(Gretschel, Catherine)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gustave Paul Passanante on behalf of Vnue, Inc...(Passanante, Gustave)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Vnue, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Document filed by DBW Investments, LLC; GOLOCK Capital, LLC..(Steinberg, Daniel)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Vnue, Inc.. Document filed by DBW Investments, LLC, GOLOCK Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GOLOCK Note 1, #2 Exhibit B - GOLOCK Note 2, #3 Exhibit C - GOLOCK Note 3, #4 Exhibit D - GOLOCK Note 4, #5 Exhibit E - GOLOCK Note 5, #6 Exhibit F - GOLOCK Amendment 1, #7 Exhibit G - GOLOCK Amendment 2, #8 Exhibit H - DBW Note 1, #9 Exhibit I - DBW Note 2, #10 Exhibit J - DBW Amendment 1, #11 Exhibit K - DBW Amendment 2, #12 Exhibit L - GOLOCK Warrant, #13 Exhibit M - DBW Warrant, #14 Exhibit N - GOLOCK Interest Calculation, #15 Exhibit O - DBW Interest Calculation, #16 Exhibit P - Irrevocable Instructions to VStock).(Steinberg, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vnue, Inc...(pc)
October 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Seth Steinberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel Seth Steinberg to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VNUE, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by DBW Investments, LLC, GOLOCK Capital, LLC..(Steinberg, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DBW Investments, LLC, GOLOCK Capital, LLC..(Steinberg, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Steinberg, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25130195)Document filed by DBW Investments, LLC, GOLOCK Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GOLOCK Note 1, #2 Exhibit B - GOLOCK Note 2, #3 Exhibit C - GOLOCK Note 3, #4 Exhibit D - GOLOCK Note 4, #5 Exhibit E - GOLOCK Note 5, #6 Exhibit F - GOLOCK Amendment 1, #7 Exhibit G - GOLOCK Amendment 2, #8 Exhibit H - DBW Note 1, #9 Exhibit I - DBW Note 2, #10 Exhibit J - DBW Amendment 1, #11 Exhibit K - DBW Amendment 2, #12 Exhibit L - GOLOCK Warrant, #13 Exhibit M - DBW Warrant, #14 Exhibit N - GOLOCK Interest Calculation, #15 Exhibit O - DBW Interest Calculation, #16 Exhibit P - Irrevocable Instructions to VStock).(Steinberg, Daniel) Modified on 10/1/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DBW Investments, LLC et al v. Vnue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DBW Investments, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Seth Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOLOCK Capital, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Seth Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vnue, Inc.
Represented By: Gustave Paul Passanante
Represented By: Catherine Gretschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?