The Lovesac Company v. WGST Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Lovesac Company
Defendant: WGST Production, Inc. and Electric Barnyard Productions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08104
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Electric Barnyard Productions, Inc. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. Service was accepted by Grace Freitas, Assistant Manager. Document filed by The Lovesac Company..(Fiano, Sabato)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. WGST Production, Inc. served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. Service was accepted by Grace Freitas, Assistant Manager. Document filed by The Lovesac Company..(Fiano, Sabato)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, January 28, 2022 at 3:15 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED parties are to submit their Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Joint Letter, as directed below, no later than Wednesday, January 19, 2022. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/9/2021) Initial Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (ks)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fiano, Sabato)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Electric Barnyard Productions, Inc., WGST Production, Inc...(pc)
October 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sabato Pellegrino Fiano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $115,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sabato Pellegrino Fiano to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
October 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WGST Production, Inc. and Electric Barnyard Productions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Lovesac Company..(Fiano, Sabato)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fiano, Sabato)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Electric Barnyard Productions, Inc., WGST Production, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25130739)Document filed by The Lovesac Company..(Fiano, Sabato)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lovesac Company v. WGST Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lovesac Company
Represented By: Sabato Pellegrino Fiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WGST Production, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Barnyard Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?