Qin v. Decker et al
Defendant: Director Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: Hao Qin
Respondent: Sheriff Carl DuBois, Thomas Decker and Acting Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv08125
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the parties, that this action shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/10/2021) (js)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Hao Qin..(McCarthy, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Alejandro Mayorkas and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Hao Qin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(McCarthy, Edward) Modified on 11/9/2021 (km).
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Alejandro Mayorkas. Document filed by Hao Qin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(McCarthy, Edward)
November 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Edward McCarthy to RE-FILE Document #14 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed stipulation and order. The document needs to have handwritten signatures of the parties. (km)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (egj)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Edward McCarthy dated 11/02/2021. Document filed by Hao Qin..(McCarthy, Edward)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Janszky, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Edward McCarthy dated 10/28/2021. Document filed by Hao Qin..(McCarthy, Edward)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mayra Pardo-Figueroa in Opposition re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Document filed by Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Criminal Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Criminal Judgment), #3 Exhibit 3 (Notice and Order of Expedited Removal)).(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: THE PARTIES' PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS APPROVED. THE GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED BY OCTOBER 26, 2021. PETITIONER'S REPLY SHALL BE FILED BY NOVEMBER 2, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Hao Qin..(McCarthy, Edward)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica F. Rosenbaum on behalf of Thomas Decker, Carl DuBois, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Rosenbaum, Jessica)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCarthy, Edward)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25137367)Document filed by Hao Qin..(McCarthy, Edward)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Edward McCarthy. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward McCarthy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Director Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; Sheriff Carl DuBois; Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas; Hao Qin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; party name was modified to add party text separately. (jgo)
October 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qin v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Carl DuBois
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hao Qin
Represented By: Edward McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?