Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd. v. Blubaugh
Plaintiff: Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd.
Defendant: Michael Blubaugh and Michael A. Blubaugh
Case Number: 1:2021cv08141
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned that the time within which Defendant, Michael A. Blubaugh may answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint herein is extended to and through December 6 2021. SO ORDERED. Michael A. Blubaugh answer due 12/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/19/2021) (kv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd...(Barrett, Kevin)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that (a) the time within which Defendant, Michael A. Blubaugh, may answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint herein is extended to and through November 21, 2021 and (b) Defendant waives any objection to (i) service of process of the summons and complaint upon Defendant and (ii) the venue of this action designated by Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Michael A. Blubaugh answer due 11/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/8/2021) (kv)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd...(Barrett, Kevin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Michael A. Blubaugh served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd...(Barrett, Kevin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael A. Blubaugh..(jgo)
October 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin W. Barrett. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael Blubaugh. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
October 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin W. Barrett. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
October 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael A. Blubaugh, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd...(Barrett, Kevin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Javelin Global Commodities Services Ltd, Corporate Parent Javelin Global Commodities Holdings LLP, Corporate Parent Uniper S.A. for Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd.. Document filed by Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd...(Barrett, Kevin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barrett, Kevin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Blubaugh. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25139280)Document filed by Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Guaranty, #2 Exhibit B - Confirmation, #3 Exhibit C - Guaranty, #4 Exhibit D - Amended #1, #5 Exhibit E - A-R Guaranty, #6 Exhibit F - Amended Confirmation, #7 Exhibit G - 2nd Guaranty, #8 Exhibit H - Amendment No. 1, #9 Exhibit I - Letter Agr., #10 Exhibit J - Double Mtn Guaranty, #11 Exhibit K - Agreements, #12 Exhibit L - Amendment #2, #13 Exhibit M - Letters, #14 Exhibit N - Term. Notices).(Barrett, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd. v. Blubaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javelin Global Commodities (UK) Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Blubaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Blubaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?