Choa et al v. Cafe TKJ Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Choa
Defendant: Cafe TKJ Inc doing business as Suki and Kelly Cho
Case Number: 1:2021cv08173
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael Antonio Faillace terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/8/2021) (js)
November 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Michael Antonio Faillace to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Joseph Choa(individually), Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catalina Sojo on behalf of Joseph Choa(individually), Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Kelly Cho served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. Service was accepted by Juan Smith, a person of suitable age and discretion. Document filed by Joseph Choa(individually); Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Cafe TKJ Inc served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Joseph Choa(individually); Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kelly Cho..(jgo)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cafe TKJ Inc..(jgo)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kevin Oates, JR on behalf of Joseph Choa(individually), Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Oates, William)
October 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kelly Cho, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Choa(individually), Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cafe TKJ Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Choa(individually), Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cafe TKJ Inc, Kelly Cho. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25146291)Document filed by Joseph Choa(individually), Joseph Choa(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choa et al v. Cafe TKJ Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Choa
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Represented By: William Kevin Oates, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe TKJ Inc doing business as Suki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?