Gribeluk v. Network Capital Funding Corporation
Plaintiff: Kelly Gribeluk
Defendant: Network Capital Funding Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv08177
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 1/13/2022. Deposition due by 4/28/2022. Expert Discovery due by 7/12/2022. Discovery due by 7/12/2022. Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2022. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/15/2021) (ama)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Conference Cancelled. Case Management Plan signed. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/15/2021) (ama)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Justin W. Reiter dated November 12, 2021. Document filed by Network Capital Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Civil Case Management Plan)).(Reiter, Justin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Warren Reiter on behalf of Network Capital Funding Corporation..(Reiter, Justin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Jeffrey Gershengorn on behalf of Network Capital Funding Corporation..(Gershengorn, Brian)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Network Capital Funding Corporation waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. Document filed by Kelly Gribeluk..(Lipsky, Douglas)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 10:45 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/14/2021) (ks)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Network Capital Funding Corporation..(jgo)
October 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas Brian Lipsky. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity);. (jgo)
October 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Kelly Gribeluk..(Isaacson, Sara)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Network Capital Funding Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kelly Gribeluk..(Lipsky, Douglas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lipsky, Douglas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Network Capital Funding Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25146976)Document filed by Kelly Gribeluk..(Lipsky, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gribeluk v. Network Capital Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Gribeluk
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Capital Funding Corporation
Represented By: Brian Jeffrey Gershengorn
Represented By: Justin Warren Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?