Carmody v. New York University et al
Plaintiff: Kristin A. Carmody
Defendant: New York University, NYU Grossman School of Medicine, NYU Langone Hospitals, Robert Grossman, M.D., Fritz Francois, Steven B. Abramson, Andrew W. Brotman and Robert J. Femia
Case Number: 1:2021cv08186
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York University, NYU Grossman School of Medicine, NYU Langone Hospitals, Robert I. Grossman, Fritz Francois, Steven B. Abramson, Andrew W. Brotman, Robert J. Femia, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Kristin A. Carmody, M.D, M.H.P.E..(Cavaleri, Damian)
October 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Damian Raphael Cavaleri to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name must match exactly as pleading on PDF and docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York University, NYU Grossman School of Medicine, NYU Langone Hospitals, Robert I. Grossman, Fritz Francois, Steven B. Abramson, Andrew W. Brotman, Robert J. Femia, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Kristin A. Carmody, M.D, M.H.P.E..(Cavaleri, Damian) Modified on 10/6/2021 (sj).
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrew W. Brotman, M.D., Fritz Francois, M.D., NYU Grossman School of Medicine, NYU Langone Hospitals, New York University, Robert I. Grossman, M.D, Robert J. Femia, M.D., Steven B. Abramson, M.D.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25151230)Document filed by Kristin A. Carmody, M.D, M.H.P.E..(Cavaleri, Damian)
October 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Damian Raphael Cavaleri to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name errors. Defendant party name listed on Summons and Summons Caption contains a typographical error, and must correspond to pleading caption and not be abbreviated. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Damian Raphael Cavaleri. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York University; NYU Grossman School of Medicine; NYU Langone Hospitals, Fritz Francois; Steven B. Abramson; Andrew W. Brotman; Robert I. Femia, Kristin A. Carmody. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly, party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
October 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Damian Raphael Cavaleri to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
October 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Damian Raphael Cavaleri. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act; Dollar Demand 5,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:206(d) FLSA: Prohibition of Sex Discrimination; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000. (vf)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYU; NYU Grossman School of Medicine; NYU Langone Hospitals; Robert I. Grossman, M.D.; Fritz Francois, M.D.; Stven B. Abramson, M.D.; Andrew W. Brotman, M.D.; Robert I. Femia, M.D., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kristin A. Carmody..(Cavaleri, Damian) Modified on 10/5/2021 (vf).
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cavaleri, Damian)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25149065)Document filed by Kristin A. Carmody..(Cavaleri, Damian) Modified on 10/5/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmody v. New York University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin A. Carmody
Represented By: Damian Raphael Cavaleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Grossman School of Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Langone Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Grossman, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W. Brotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Femia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?