White v. GM Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn L. White
Defendant: GM Motor Company, Mary Barra, Mark Reuss, Dan Ammann and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv08241
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letters served on Plaintiffs Larry Anderson and Evelyn White on November 16, 2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:21-cv-01006-JMF, 1:21-cv-08241-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (15 in 1:21-cv-08241-JMF, 8658 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF) Letter, filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED IN PART. New GM shall file any motion to dismiss or answer by December 22, 2021. Plaintiff shall file any opposition by January 19, 2022. New GM shall file any reply by February 2, 2022. In the event that the motion is denied, the Court will address next steps. New GM shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/22/2021., Responses due by 1/19/2022, Replies due by 2/2/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/15/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:21-cv-08241-JMF (jca)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (16 in 1:21-cv-08241-JMF, 98 in 1:21-cv-01006-JMF, 8659 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF) Letter Order re Anderson Vehicle Inspection, filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT : By December 17, 2021, New GM shall file a letter (1) informing the Court whether the inspection has occurred and (2) stating whether there is any reason to continue to delay a decision on New GM's motion to enforce the settlement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/15/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:21-cv-01006-JMF, 1:21-cv-08241-JMF (yv)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: General Motors LLC answer due 12/22/2021. (jca)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated November 12, 2021 re: October 29, 2021 ECF No. 8650 Order re Anderson Vehicle Inspection. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:21-cv-01006-JMF, 1:21-cv-08241-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated November 12, 2021 re: Proposed Next Steps Regarding Plaintiff Evelyn White. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:21-cv-08241-JMF.(Bloom, Wendy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (sjo)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Plaintiff Evelyn White on November 2, 2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Bloom, Wendy)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The deadline to meet and confer and propose next steps in this case is hereby EXTENDED, nunc pro tunc, to November 12, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/2/2021) (kv)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wendy L. Bloom dated November 1, 2021 re: White Case Update and Next Steps. Document filed by General Motors LLC..(Bloom, Wendy)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Plaintiffs Larry Anderson and Evelyn White on November 1, 2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Bloom, Wendy)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: In the Court's judgment, the parties should sort out the inspection issue before a decision is rendered on New GM's motion for civil contempt. Accordingly, the parties in these cases are hereby ORDERED to promptly confer with respect to whether and when an inspection of the vehicle could take place. New GM shall report back to the Court no later than November 12, 2021. In the meantime, the Court will reserve decision on New GM's motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/29/2021) (js)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Plaintiff Evelyn White on October 26, 2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Bloom, Wendy)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Evelyn L. White 64 Wyandotte Ave. Apt. Lower Buffalo, NY 14207, at, on 10/14/2021 Re: (8624 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 7 in 1:21-cv-08241-JMF) Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, Order granting IFP application, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : Although Plaintiff does not name it as such, the Complaint appears to allege wrongdoing by General Motors LLC ("New GM"). The Clerk of Court is therefore directed, under Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to amend the caption of 21-CV-8241 to add General Motors LLC as a defendant. This amendment is without prejudice to any defenses that New GM may wish to assert. New GM is hereby ORDERED to confer with Plaintiff (and, if appropriate Lead Counsel) to discuss how to proceed with resolving Plaintiff's claims and, no later than November 3, 2021, the parties shall file a joint letter proposing next steps. The Court requests that New GM waive service of process in 21-CV-8241. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/13/21) (yv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/6/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION of Evelyn L. White in Support re: #3 MOTION GM faulty ignition switch re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Evelyn L. White. (sac)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION re: GM faulty ignition switch re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Evelyn L. White. (sac)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Dan Ammann, Mary Barra, GM Motor Company, Mark Reuss. Document filed by Evelyn L. White. (sac)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Evelyn L. White. (sac)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. GM Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Barra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Reuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ammann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?