Sanchez v. E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Sanchez
Defendant: E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc. and Richard Uffer
Case Number: 1:2021cv08266
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc. waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022; Richard Uffer waiver sent on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Uffer..(pc)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc...(pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Uffer, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob)
October 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 10/15/2021 (pc).
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 10/15/2021 (pc).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/12/2021) (jca)
October 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; all of the party name must be listed on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mr. Richard Uffer, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 10/8/2021 (jgo).
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to E.I.G. Auto Salvage, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 10/8/2021 (jgo).
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aronauer, Jacob)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc., Richard Uffer. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25162381)Document filed by Jose Luis Sanchez..(Aronauer, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Sanchez
Represented By: Jacob Aronauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I.G. Auto Salvage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Uffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?