Paparone-Donadio v. District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Paparone-Donadio
Defendant: District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, Board of Education Employees Local 372, District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, New York City Department of Education and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv08278
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Ellis on behalf of City of New York, New York City Department of Education..(Ellis, Zachary)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #16 Letter filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED., City of New York answer due 12/13/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/12/2021) (ama)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from William S.J. Fraenkel dated November 10, 2021 re: First Request for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by City of New York..(Fraenkel, William)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. 1. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, April 15, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences, as further set forth. 6. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/28/2021) (mml)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Danielle R. Acker Susanj to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(jgo)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO..(jgo)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(jgo)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Education Employees Local 372, District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO..(jgo)
October 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Danielle R. Acker Susanj to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25166328. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tyler K. Patterson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
October 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Danielle R. Acker Susanj to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25166328. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania, #3 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Proposed Order).(Susanj, Danielle)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Board of Education Employees Local 372, District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Patterson, Tyler)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Education Employees Local 372, District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, City of New York, District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25164602)Document filed by Crystal Paparone-Donadio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Patterson, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paparone-Donadio v. District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Paparone-Donadio
Represented By: Danielle Susanj
Represented By: Tyler K. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education Employees Local 372, District Council 37, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Zachary Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Zachary Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?