SH Beauty Inc. v. Face Lace Ltd
Plaintiff: SH BEAUTY INC and SH Beauty Inc.
Defendant: FACE LACE LTD
Case Number: 1:2021cv08322
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 cp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on December 21, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 12/21/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/8/2021) (va)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Face Lace Ltd..(jgo)
October 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marcella Ballard. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SH BEAUTY INC; FACE LACE LTD. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SH Beauty S.R.L., Corporate Parent Flash Beauty Holdings, S.R.L. for SH BEAUTY INC. Document filed by SH BEAUTY INC..(Ballard, Marcella)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FACE LACE LTD, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SH BEAUTY INC..(Ballard, Marcella)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ballard, Marcella)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FACE LACE LTD. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25171398)Document filed by SH BEAUTY INC..(Ballard, Marcella)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SH Beauty Inc. v. Face Lace Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SH BEAUTY INC
Represented By: Marcella Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SH Beauty Inc.
Represented By: Marcella Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACE LACE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?