Project South et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Project South and Center for Constitutional Rights
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review and United States Department of State
Case Number: 1:2021cv08440
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial case management conference scheduled for January 4, 2022 (Dkt. No. 23) is adjourned to February 3, 2022 at 11 a.m., in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/10/2021) (ate)
December 9, 2021 Filing 26 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Talia Kraemer dated Dec. 9, 2021. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia)
December 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #22 granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Ghita Schwarz as counsel of record for plaintiff in this action. SO ORDERED. Attorney Ghita Schwarz terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/03/2021) (ama)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: This action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses. It appearing to the Court that no initial case management conference has yet taken place in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that an initial conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P.16 will be held on January 4, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, NewYork, New York. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c). It is further ORDERED that counsel shall meet and confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than 21 days prior to the initial case management conference. No later than one week (seven calendar days) prior to the conference, the parties shall file a Pre-Conference Statement, via ECF, signed by counsel for all parties. The Statement, which will constitute the written report required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(2), shall contain the following information: and further set forth in this Order. (Initial Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/3/2021) (rro)
December 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Ghita Schwarz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Schwarz, Ghita)
December 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Baher Azmy on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Azmy, Baher)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/1/2021) (ate)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated Nov. 10, 2021, #17 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated Nov. 10, 2021. United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review answer due 11/29/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 11/29/2021; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 11/29/2021; United States Department of State answer due 11/29/2021; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 11/29/2021; granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated Nov. 10, 2021, #17 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated Nov. 10, 2021. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the letter motions at ECF Nos. 15, 17. SO ORDERED. United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review answer due 11/29/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 11/29/2021; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 11/29/2021; United States Department of State answer due 11/29/2021; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 11/29/2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/16/2021) (va)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated Nov. 10, 2021. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated Nov. 10, 2021. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kraemer, Talia)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021; United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021; United States Department of State served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Project South; Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1).(Sisay, Samah)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Schwarz, Ghita)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review. (vf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (vf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (vf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (vf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (vf)
October 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Sisay, Samah)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Sisay, Samah)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Sisay, Samah)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Sisay, Samah)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Project South..(Sisay, Samah)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sisay, Samah)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25188868)Document filed by Project South, Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1).(Sisay, Samah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project South et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project South
Represented By: Samah Mcgona Sisay
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights
Represented By: Samah Mcgona Sisay
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?