Nanobebe US Inc. v. Mayborn (UK) Limited et al
Plaintiff: Nanobebe US Inc.
Defendant: Mayborn (UK) Limited, Mayborn USA, Inc. and Mayborn Group Limited
Case Number: 1:2021cv08444
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 . Defendants' November 5, 2021 request for an extension to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, Dkt. No. 18, is granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to January 13, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
November 5, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. No. 1) addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from John S. Goetz dated November 5, 2021. Document filed by Mayborn (UK) Limited, Mayborn Group Limited, Mayborn USA, Inc...(Goetz, John)
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mayborn (UK) Limited waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie)
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mayborn Group Limited waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie)
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Stephen Goetz on behalf of Mayborn (UK) Limited, Mayborn Group Limited, Mayborn USA, Inc...(Goetz, John)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Mayborn USA, Inc. served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. Service was accepted by registered agent, Corporation Service Company, by a legal representative authorized by appointment. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons issued to Defendant Mayborn USA, Inc.).(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Courts Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Courts website, for the dial- in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Courts Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/14/2021) (tg)
October 14, 2021 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #13 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (js)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mayborn USA, Inc...(pc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mayborn Group Limited..(pc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mayborn (UK) Limited..(pc)
October 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elana Araj on behalf of Nanobebe US Inc...(Araj, Elana)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nutrits Ltd. for Nanobebe US Inc.. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn Group Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn (UK) Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mayborn (UK) Limited, Mayborn Group Limited, Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25189436)Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent # 10952930, #2 Exhibit 2- Assignment, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 11, 2021 Amazon Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - August 30, 2021 Response, #5 Exhibit 5 - August 31, 201 Communication, #6 Exhibit 6 - September 15, 2021 Communication, #7 Exhibit 7 - September 23, 2021 Amazon Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 - Mayborn Executed Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 Amazon Utility Patent Neutral Evaluation Procedure, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mayborn Group Website, #11 Exhibit 11 - Linkedin Communications, #12 Exhibit 12 - May & July 2019 Communications, #13 Exhibit 13 - June-Aug 2020 Communications).(Bookbinder, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nanobebe US Inc. v. Mayborn (UK) Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanobebe US Inc.
Represented By: Elana Araj
Represented By: Julie Pamela Bookbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayborn (UK) Limited
Represented By: John Stephen Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayborn USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Stephen Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayborn Group Limited
Represented By: John Stephen Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?