123RF LLC v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.,
Plaintiff: 123RF LLC
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, N.A., and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08519
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Conference held on 1/10/2022. (ade)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order The dial-in for today's 1:00 p.m. conference is 888-363-4749; access code: 2712517. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald) (Text Only Order) (Braly, Jacob)
December 16, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Evan S. Fensterstock dated December 16, 2021 re: #21 LETTER MOTION for Conference requesting pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Preston L. Zarlock dated December 13, 2021. . Document filed by 123RF LLC..(Fensterstock, Evan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Conference requesting pre-motion conference for motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Preston L. Zarlock dated December 13, 2021. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A...(Zarlock, Preston)
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evangeline Zimmerman Burbidge on behalf of 123RF LLC..(Burbidge, Evangeline)
December 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Llewellyn on behalf of 123RF LLC..(Llewellyn, Paul)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for Evangeline A.Z. Burbidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/29/2021) (mml) Modified on 11/30/2021 (mml).
November 24, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Evangeline A.Z. Burbidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Evangeline A.Z. Burbidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 123RF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Utah Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - California Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fensterstock, Evan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Paul T. Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/16/2021) (mml)
November 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Paul T. Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Paul T. Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 123RF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Fensterstock, Evan)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeremy M. Amar-Dolan dated November 12, 2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. answer due 12/13/2021. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/12/2021) (mml)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Preston Lee Zarlock on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A...(Zarlock, Preston)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc, Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A...(Amar-Dolan, Jeremy)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeremy M. Amar-Dolan dated November 12, 2021. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A...(Amar-Dolan, Jeremy)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A...(Amar-Dolan, Jeremy)
November 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Paul T. Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25274988. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
November 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Evangeline A.Z. Burbidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25274832. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Utah and California. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for these states.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul T. Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25274988. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 123RF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Llewellyn Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Fensterstock, Evan) Modified on 11/3/2021 (bcu).
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Evangeline A.Z. Burbidge to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff, 123RF LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25274832. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 123RF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Burbidge Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Utah Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - California Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fensterstock, Evan) Modified on 11/3/2021 (bcu).
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. served on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. Service was accepted by Noel Gerena, Authorized Person to Accept Service. Document filed by 123RF LLC..(Fensterstock, Evan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A...(pc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/18/2021) (pc).
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Evan Steele Fensterstock. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
October 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tobias George Snyder on behalf of 123RF LLC..(Snyder, Tobias)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSBC BANK USA, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 123RF LLC..(Fensterstock, Evan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent 123RF Limited, Corporate Parent Inmagine Lab Pte. Ltd., Corporate Parent Inmagine Inc. for 123RF LLC. Document filed by 123RF LLC..(Fensterstock, Evan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fensterstock, Evan)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HSBC BANK USA, N.A.,. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25201868)Document filed by 123RF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - USCDAA, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Schedule).(Fensterstock, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 123RF LLC v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 123RF LLC
Represented By: Tobias George Snyder
Represented By: Evan Steele Fensterstock
Represented By: Evangeline Zimmerman Burbidge
Represented By: Paul Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan
Represented By: Preston Lee Zarlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?