Keitel et al v. D'Agostino, Sr. et al
Plaintiff: FJK IV Properties, Inc., Frederick J. Keitel, III, FJK Tee Jay Inc., Florida Capital Management LLC and FJK Tee Jay, LTD
Defendant: Thomas B. D'Agostino, Sr., Thomas B. and Elzbieta D'Agostino 1997 CRT Trust, Elzbieta D'Agostino, Schain Leifer Guralnick, Karen Stein, Tee Jay of Florida RLLP, Tee Jay of Florida G.P., FJK Tee Jay, Inc., Eric C Christu, Esq., Shutts & Bowen,LLP, Jonathan P. Hart, Esq., Esq. Robert L. King, Jonathan D'Agostino, Florida RLLP, Larry Glick, Esq. James A. Farrell, Arthur J. Menor, Heather L. Reis, Fox Rothschild LLP, Andrew Rose, Esq., The Estate of Meenu Sasser, Esq. Wilton White, Haile Shaw Pfaffenberger PA, Nason, Yeager, Gerson, Harris & Fumero, Leslie Adams, Peter J Callahan, Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, P.A, Esq. Richard Blackstone Webber, Bradley ANDERSON, Esq. Kevin P. Robinson, James A. Farrell, Heather L. Reis, Esq., Wilton White, Esq., Leslie Adams, Esq., Richard Blackstone Webber, II Esq. and Bradley Anderson, Esq.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr., JONATHAN P. HART, TEE JAY OF FLORIDA, G.P., Frederick J Keitel, JONATHAN DAGOSTINO and FJK-TEE JAY, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv08537
Filed: October 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents All Defendants added. Party added pursuant to #5 Complaint,,, #4 Amended Complaint,,,,.Document filed by Wilton White, James A. Farrell, Eric C Christu, Esq., FJK TEE JAY, INC., Leslie Adams, JONATHAN P. HART, TEE JAY OF FLORIDA, G.P., Frederick J Keitel, Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr., Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr., HEATHER L. REIS, Bradley Anderson, Esq., ARTHUR J. MENOR, Richard Blackstone Webber, TEE JAY OF FLORIDA, G.P., Robert L. King, Karen Stein, JONATHAN DAGOSTINO, FJK-TEE JAY, LTD., LARRY GLICK, Kevin P. Robinson, Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr.. Related document: #5 Complaint,,, #4 Amended Complaint,,,,..(Robbins, Spencer)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Spencer Robbins re: Document No. #5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Party names must be entered in all capacities with party text as it corresponds to the pleading caption. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. (vf)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Bradley Anderson, Esq., Andrew Rose, Esq., Arthur J. Menor, Peter J Callahan, Eric C Christu, Esq., Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr., Thomas B. D'Agostino, Sr., Elzbieta D'Agostino, FJK Tee Jay, Inc., FJK Tee Jay, LTD, James A. Farrell, Fox Rothschild LLP, Haile Shaw Pfaffenberger PA, Heather L. Reis, Esq., Jonathan D'Agostino, Jonathan P. Hart, Esq., Robert L. King, Larry Glick, Leslie Adams, Esq., Richard Blackstone Webber, II Esq., Kevin P. Robinson, Schain Leifer Guralnick, Shutts & Bowen,LLP, Karen Stein, Tee Jay of Florida G.P., Tee Jay of Florida RLLP, The Estate of Meenu Sasser, Wilton White, Esq., Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, P.A. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25339242)Document filed by Frederick J. Keitel, III, FJK Tee Jay, LTD, FJK Tee Jay Inc., Florida Capital Management LLC..(Robbins, Spencer)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Spencer Robbins to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the complaint must be correctly filed before filing an Amended Complaint. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Bradley Anderson, Esq., Andrew Rose, Esq., Arthur J. Menor, Peter J Callahan, Eric C Christu, Esq., Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr., Thomas B. D'Agostino, Sr., Elzbieta D'Agostino, FJK Tee Jay, Inc., FJK Tee Jay, LTD, James A. Farrell, Fox Rothschild LLP, Haile Shaw Pfaffenberger PA, Heather L. Reis, Esq., Jonathan D'Agostino, Jonathan P. Hart, Esq., Robert L. King, Larry Glick, Leslie Adams, Esq., Richard Blackstone Webber, II Esq., Kevin P. Robinson, Schain Leifer Guralnick, Shutts & Bowen,LLP, Karen Stein, Tee Jay of Florida G.P., Tee Jay of Florida RLLP, The Estate of Meenu Sasser, Wilton White, Esq., Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, P.A with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Frederick J. Keitel, III, FJK Tee Jay, LTD, FJK Tee Jay Inc., Florida Capital Management LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Robbins, Spencer) Modified on 11/15/2021 (sj).
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RICO STATEMENT . Document filed by FJK Tee Jay Inc., FJK Tee Jay, LTD, Florida Capital Management LLC..(Robbins, Spencer)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/19/2021) (tg)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Spencer Robbins. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Frederick J. Keitel, III,FJK Tee Jay Inc., Florida Capital Management LLC, FJK Tee Jay, LTD, Thomas B. D'Agostino, Sr., Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr., Elzbieta D'Agostino, Schain Leifer Guralnick, Karen Stein, Tee Jay of Florida RLLP, Tee Jay of Florida G.P., FJK Tee Jay, Inc., Eric C Christu, Esq., Eric C Christu, Esq., Shutts & Bowen,LLP, Jonathan P. Hart, Esq., Robert L. King, Jonathan D'Agostino,Florida RLLP, FJK Tee Jay, LTD, Larry Glick, James A. Farrell, Arthur J. Menor, Heather L. Reis, Fox Rothschild LLP, The Estate of Meenu Sasser, Andrew Rose, Wilton White, Haile Shaw Pfaffenberger PA, Nason, Yeager, Gerson, Harris & Fumero, Leslie Adams, Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, P.A, Richard Blackstone Webber, Bradley Anderson, Kevin P. Robinson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; party named entered incorrectly. (vf)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Spencer Robbins. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: FJK IV Properties, Inc., Florida RLLP, Nason, Yeager, Gerson, Harris, & Fumerom, P.A. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Spencer Robbins to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the All Defendant radio button was selected; not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Spencer Robbins. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25205472)Document filed by Frederick Keitel, III..(Robbins, Spencer) Modified on 10/18/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keitel et al v. D'Agostino, Sr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FJK IV Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick J. Keitel, III
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FJK Tee Jay Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FJK Tee Jay, LTD
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. D'Agostino, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. and Elzbieta D'Agostino 1997 CRT Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elzbieta D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schain Leifer Guralnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tee Jay of Florida RLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tee Jay of Florida G.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FJK Tee Jay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric C Christu, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shutts & Bowen,LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Hart, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Robert L. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida RLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. James A. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Menor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather L. Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Rothschild LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Rose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Meenu Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Wilton White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haile Shaw Pfaffenberger PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nason, Yeager, Gerson, Harris & Fumero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, P.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Richard Blackstone Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Kevin P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather L. Reis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilton White, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Adams, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Blackstone Webber, II Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Thomas B. D'Agostino, Jr.
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: JONATHAN P. HART
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: TEE JAY OF FLORIDA, G.P.
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Frederick J Keitel
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: JONATHAN DAGOSTINO
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: FJK-TEE JAY, LTD.
Represented By: Spencer Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?