Mave Hotel Investors LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London et al
Plaintiff: Mave Hotel Investors LLC and Mave Hotel Investors LLC doing business as The Mave Hotel
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London and HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE
Case Number: 1:2021cv08743
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Plaintiff, Mave Hotel Investors LLC, d/b/a The Mave Hotel, and defendants, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AS LLOYD'S, LONDON, and HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE, individually and severally subscribed to Commercial Property Insurance Policy No. DCESP01372-02, that Defendants' time to Answer the Complaint in the above-captioned action is hereby extended to January 17, 2022. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants waive any affirmative defenses related to insufficiency of service of process. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that for the purposes of this stipulation, that facsimile or electronic signatures and a facsimile or electronic copy of this stipulation shall be considered an original. SO ORDERED. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London answer due 1/17/2022; HDI Global Specialty SE answer due 1/17/2022. Motions terminated: #14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Eric R. Leibowitz, Esq. dated December 20, 2021 filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2021) (vfr)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #8 Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Eric R. Leibowitz, Esq. dated December 20, 2021. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer).(Leibowitz, Eric)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. Service was accepted by Richard DiGiovanna, NY Dep't of State. Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. HDI Global Specialty SE served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. Service was accepted by Richard DiGiovanna. Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/9/2021) (mml)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 27, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. 2. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. ( As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/9/2021) (vfr)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/9/2021) (vfr)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, HDI Global Specialty SE. Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HDI Global Specialty SE. (vf)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (vf)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Manuel Kaplan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HDI Global Specialty SE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Manuel Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaplan, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HDI Global Specialty SE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Mave Hotel Investors LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25244223)Document filed by Mave Hotel Investors LLC..(Kaplan, Robert) Modified on 10/27/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mave Hotel Investors LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mave Hotel Investors LLC
Represented By: Robert Manuel Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mave Hotel Investors LLC doing business as The Mave Hotel
Represented By: Robert Manuel Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE
Represented By: Eric Ronald Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?