Salta Jr. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Romeo Salta Jr. and Phyllis Polega
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv08911
Filed: October 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/21/2021) (kv)
December 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 2/17/2022. (kv)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alexander J. Hogan dated December 20, 2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Hogan, Alexander)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 29, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States of America served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. Service was accepted by Civil Clerk Lisa Ahern. Document filed by Romeo Salta Jr.; Phyllis Polega., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint with attachments served on Unitetd States of America on 11/03/21. Service was accepted by Civil Clerk Lisa Ahern. Document filed by Romeo Salta Jr.; Phyllis Polega..(Fenstermaker, Scott)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(jgo)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Phyllis Polega, Romeo Salta Jr...(Fenstermaker, Scott)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Romeo Salta Jr., Phyllis Polega., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Romeo Salta Jr., Phyllis Polega..(Fenstermaker, Scott)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Lloyd Fenstermaker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $113,087,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $113,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Lloyd Fenstermaker. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Romeo Salta Jr., Phyllis Polega, United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
November 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Lloyd Fenstermaker to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
October 31, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fenstermaker, Scott)
October 31, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Phylliis Polega, Romeo Salta..(Fenstermaker, Scott) Modified on 11/1/2021 (sj).
October 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25267559)Document filed by Romeo Salta, Phylliis Polega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit).(Fenstermaker, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salta Jr. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo Salta Jr.
Represented By: Scott Lloyd Fenstermaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Polega
Represented By: Scott Lloyd Fenstermaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander James Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?