Sigalit v. Kahlon
Plaintiff: Sigalit Yehuda and Yehuda Sigalit
Defendant: Jossef Kahlon
Case Number: 1:2021cv08921
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Pre-trial Submissions. Document filed by Yehuda Sigalit..(Haffner, Steven)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Haffner, Steven)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jossef Kahlon. (vf)
November 26, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jossef Kahlon, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yehuda Sigalit..(Haffner, Steven)
November 26, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Haffner, Steven)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 30, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven R. Haffner. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven R. Haffner to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven R. Haffner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to Queens; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven R. Haffner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sigalit Yehuda; Jossef Kahlon. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
November 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Sigalit Yehuda. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25268806)Document filed by Sigalit Yehuda..(Haffner, Steven) Modified on 11/2/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sigalit v. Kahlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigalit Yehuda
Represented By: Steven R. Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yehuda Sigalit
Represented By: Steven R. Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jossef Kahlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?