Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Ifill
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and New York City District Council of Carpenters
Respondent: Stephen Ifill doing business as Mur Construction
Case Number: 1:2021cv08937
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Petitioner shall serve Respondent by February 1, 2022. SO ORDERED. Service due by 2/1/2022.. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/29/2021) (kv)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Nicole Marimon, Esq. dated December 28, 2021. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Petitioners were directed to file proof of service of the Petition and the accompanying materials on Respondent on or before November 10, 2021. To date, they have not done so. Petitioners are hereby ORDERED to serve the Petition and accompanying materials on Respondent, if not yet done so, and file the aforementioned proof of service on ECF by December 29, 2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/22/2021) (ate)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Petitioners are directed to file proof of service of the Petition and the accompanying materials with the Court on or before November 10, 2021. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/3/2021) (ate)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen Ifill..(pc)
November 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen Ifill d/b/a MUR Construction, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION..Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Assent, #2 DDC - Rehabilitation Renovation, #3 2020_Citywide_Renovation_PLA_Agency_Solicitation_Version, #4 Independent Building Construction 2017 - 2024, #5 January 2016 Revised Collection Policy, #6 May 17, 2021 Notice of Hearing, #7 August 6, 2021 Arbitration Award, #8 History Bill for the Court, #9 Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Ifill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Funds
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Ifill doing business as Mur Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?