Farsura et al v. QC Terme US Corp et al
Plaintiff: Stefano Farsura and SF Capital Partners LLC
Defendant: QC Terme US Corp, MAP s.r.I.,, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A., and Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,
Case Number: 1:2021cv09030
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties letters dated December 16 and 17, 2021, ECF Nos. 24, 25, & 26. Accordingly: Defendants' request for leave to file a motion to stay discovery pending a decision on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss is DENIED; By January 3, 2022, the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed case management plan and scheduling order pursuant to the Court's order dated November 16, 2021, ECF No. 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/20/2021) (ama)
December 17, 2021 Filing 26 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Vincent Levy and Tara M. Lee dated December 17, 2021 re: Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Levy, Vincent)
December 16, 2021 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tara M. Lee dated December 16, 2021 re: Basis for Subject-Matter Jurisdiction Founded on Diversity of Citizenship. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
December 16, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tara M. Lee dated December 16, 2021 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter for Motion to Stay Discovery. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters, ECF Nos. 21 & 22. Accordingly: Defendants' request for leave to file a motion to dismiss is GRANTED; By February 2, 2022, Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss; By March 2, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers; By March 23, 2022, Defendants shall file their reply, if any. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 2/2/2022., Responses due by 3/2/2022, Replies due by 3/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/08/2021) (ama)
December 7, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Vincent Levy dated December 7, 2021 re: Response to Defendants' November 30, 2021 Letter (Dkt. 21). Document filed by Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC..(Levy, Vincent)
November 30, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tara M. Lee dated November 30, 2021 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Scott Edward Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JMS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hannelore Sklar on behalf of Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Sklar, Hannelore)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by December 17, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/16/2021) (kv)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC.(Levy, Vincent)
November 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Scott Edward Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25335757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Vincent Levy dated November 15, 2021 re: response to Your Honor's correspondence of November 8, 2021. Document filed by Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC..(Levy, Vincent)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Scott Edward Lerner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25335757. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of S. Lerner Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A: NY Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Lerner, Scott)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tara M. Lee dated November 5, 2021. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Giuturna Investments S.p.A., answer due 12/13/2021; MAP s.r.I., answer due 12/13/2021; QC Terme US Corp answer due 12/13/2021; Whitebridge Investments S.p.A., answer due 12/13/2021. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/8/2021) (jca)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Tara M. Lee dated November 5, 2021. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, the Individual Practices of Judge Analisa Torres, and the SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions on November 4, 2021. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Taylor Goldman on behalf of Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC..(Goldman, Brian)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Peter Goldberg on behalf of Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC..(Goldberg, Daniel)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC..(Levy, Vincent)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Gregory Levy on behalf of Stefano Farsura, SF Capital Partners LLC..(Levy, Vincent)
November 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent QC Terme s.r.l for QC Terme US Corp. Document filed by QC Terme US Corp..(Lee, Tara)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara M Lee on behalf of Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,..(Lee, Tara)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, Tara)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme New York, County of New York. Case Number: 655339/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25279746).Document filed by Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,, MAP s.r.I.,, QC Terme US Corp, Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Francesco Varni, #2 Exhibit B Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Service on QC Terme US Corp., #4 Exhibit D Affidavits of Service on MAP s.r.l., White Bridge Investments S.p.A., and Giuturna Investments S.p.A.).(Lee, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farsura et al v. QC Terme US Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefano Farsura
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Peter Goldberg
Represented By: Vincent Gregory Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SF Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Brian Taylor Goldman
Represented By: Daniel Peter Goldberg
Represented By: Vincent Gregory Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QC Terme US Corp
Represented By: Tara M Lee
Represented By: Scott Lerner
Represented By: Hannelore Sklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAP s.r.I.,
Represented By: Tara M Lee
Represented By: Scott Lerner
Represented By: Hannelore Sklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitebridge Investments S.p.A.,
Represented By: Tara M Lee
Represented By: Scott Lerner
Represented By: Hannelore Sklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuturna Investments S.p.A.,
Represented By: Tara M Lee
Represented By: Scott Lerner
Represented By: Hannelore Sklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?