American Infertility of New York, P.C. v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction and American Infertility of New York, P.C. doing business as Center for Human Reproduction
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, UR M. JADOU and CONNIE NOLAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv09275
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 055
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The time for the defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to a time to be set at the initial conference scheduled for January 21, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/21/2021) (jca)
November 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Connie Nolan served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C...(Heppt, Edward)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ur M. Jadou served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C...(Heppt, Edward)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C...(Heppt, Edward)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur M. Jadou..(jgo)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Connie Nolan..(jgo)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas..(jgo)
November 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward Joseph Heppt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction; UR M. JADOU; CONNIE NOLAN. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CONNIE NOLAN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction..(Heppt, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UR M. JADOU, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction..(Heppt, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction..(Heppt, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction..(Heppt, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heppt, Edward)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UR M. JADOU, Alejandro Mayorkas, CONNIE NOLAN. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25312755)Document filed by American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction..(Heppt, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Infertility of New York, P.C. v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Infertility of New York, P.C. d/b/a Center for Human Reproduction
Represented By: Edward Joseph Heppt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Infertility of New York, P.C. doing business as Center for Human Reproduction
Represented By: Edward Joseph Heppt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. JADOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE NOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?