GateGuard, Inc. v. Amazon.com Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: GateGuard, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC and Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09321
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 sc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Eden P. Quainton dated 1/2/2022 re: Response to Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by GateGuard, Inc...(Quainton, Eden)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Conference re: #9 LETTER MOTION for Conference -- Pre-Motion Conference re: Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Anne Champion dated December 16, 2021. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on January 7, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. The parties may access the pre-motion conference using the following dial-in: (888) 363-4749, with access code 8140049. The time to respond to the complaint is extended to a date to be set at the pre-motion conference. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/17/2021) (va)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Conference -- Pre-Motion Conference re: Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Anne Champion dated December 16, 2021. Document filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Champion, Anne)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC; Corporate Parent, no corporate parent and no publicly held coporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock for Amazon.com Inc.. Document filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Champion, Anne)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Jonathan Stock on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Stock, Eric)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Daniel Belelieu on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Belelieu, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Marie Champion on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC..(Champion, Anne)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC..(gp)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon Logistics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GateGuard, Inc...(Quainton, Eden)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Quainton, Eden)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Eden P. Quainton. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eden P. Quainton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC, GateGuard, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eden P. Quainton. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25319983)Document filed by GateGuard, Inc...(Quainton, Eden)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GateGuard, Inc. v. Amazon.com Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GateGuard, Inc.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Belelieu
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Belelieu
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Belelieu
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?