Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp.
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and New York City District Council of Carpenters
Respondent: U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. and U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. d/b/a U.S. Smoke & Fire Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv09363
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Petition,,,, served. U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. d/b/a U.S. Smoke & Fire Services LLC served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. Service was accepted by Pablo Vasquez, technical estimator. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; New York City District Council of Carpenters; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, 1. By January 13, 2022, Petitioners shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which they intend to support the petition, including memoranda of law, the arbitration award, supporting documents, and any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits are true and correct copies of what they purport to be; 2.By February 3, 2022, Respondent shall file its opposition papers; and 3.By February 17, 2022, Petitioners shall file their reply, if any. By January 7, 2022, Petitioners shall serve a copy of the petition and this order upon Respondent by personal service on an officer, director, managing or general agent, or cashier or assistant cashier or to any other agent authorized by appointment or by law to receive service. By January 14, 2022, Petitioners shall file an affidavit of such service. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/3/2021) (kv)
December 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/3/2022 Replies due by 2/17/2022. (kv)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. d/b/a U.S. Smoke & Fire Services LLC..(gp)
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 Amended Petition,,,, . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 2, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. d/b/a U.S. Smoke & Fire Services LLC, re: #9 Amended Petition,,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED PETITION amending #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, against U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. d/b/a U.S. Smoke & Fire Services LLC.Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. Related document: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LOA, #2 Exhibit B - Finalized LGA Airport PLA, #3 Exhibit C - Independent Building Construction 2017 - 2024, #4 Exhibit D - January 2016 Revised Collection Policy, #5 Exhibit E - April 28, 2021 Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit F - July 14, 2021 Arbitration Award, #7 Exhibit G- History Bill for the Court, #8 Exhibit H - Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the briefing schedule set forth in the Courts November 23, 2021 order and an amendment to the portion of the Courts order regarding service addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Nicole Marimon, Esq. dated December 2, 2021. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, filed by New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York. Accordingly, 1. By December 13, 2021, Petitioners shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which they intend to support the petition, including memoranda of law, the arbitration award, supporting documents, and any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits are true and correct copies of what they purport to be; 2. By December 27, 2021, Respondent shall file its opposition papers; and 3. By January 3, 2022, Petitioners shall file their reply, if any. By December 7, 2021, Petitioners shall serve a copy of the petition and this order upon Respondent by personal service on an officer, director, managing or general agent, or cashier or assistant cashier or to any other agent authorized by appointment or by law to receive service, pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L.R. 311, and upon the secretary of state, pursuant to N.Y. Bus. Corp. Law 306. By December 14, 2021, Petitioners shall file an affidavit of such service. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/27/2021, Replies due by 1/3/2022.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/23/2021) (kv)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp...(jgo)
November 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,, . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25325914).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 LOA, #2 Finalized LGA Airport PLA, #3 Independent Building Construction 2017 - 2024, #4 January 2016 Revised Collection Policy, #5 April 28, 2021 Notice of Hearing, #6 July 14, 2021 Arbitration Award, #7 History Bill for the Court, #8 Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Smoke & Fire Corp. d/b/a U.S. Smoke & Fire Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?