Muntaz v. Fairygodboss Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Riaasa Muntaz
Defendant: Fairygodboss Inc., Romy Newman, Maura Bradley and Danna Hendrickson
Case Number: 1:2021cv09386
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Maura Bradley, Fairygodboss Inc., Danna Hendrickson, Romy Newman..(Lichtenberg, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that pursuant to the Southern District of New York's Second Amended Standing Administrative Order of October 1, 2015 regarding employment discrimination cases, this case is designated for automatic referral under the Court's existing Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation. In addition, initial discovery in this case shall be conducted in accordance with the Pilot Discovery Protocols for Counseled Employment Cases ("Discovery Protocols"). A copy of the Discovery Protocols is attached to this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Southern District mediation process is unsuccessful, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial status conference on April 15, 2022 at 12:30 p.m. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/3/2022) (rro)
December 29, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Maura Bradley, Fairygodboss Inc., Danna Hendrickson, Romy Newman..(Lichtenberg, David)
December 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Maura Bradley, Fairygodboss Inc., Danna Hendrickson, Romy Newman..(Lichtenberg, David)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Maura Bradley served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; Fairygodboss Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; Danna Hendrickson served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; Romy Newman served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Service was accepted by Christopher J. Capone, Attorney for Defendants. Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Romy Newman. (vf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maura Bradley. (vf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danna Hendrickson. (vf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fairygodboss Inc. (vf)
November 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Travis Pierre-Louis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1981ra Race Discrimination. (vf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Romy Newman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maura Bradley, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Danna Hendrickson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fairygodboss Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maura Bradley, Fairygodboss Inc., Danna Hendrickson, Romy Newman. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25329263)Document filed by Riaasa Muntaz..(Pierre-Louis, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muntaz v. Fairygodboss Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riaasa Muntaz
Represented By: Travis Pierre-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairygodboss Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Lichtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romy Newman
Represented By: David Brian Lichtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Bradley
Represented By: David Brian Lichtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danna Hendrickson
Represented By: David Brian Lichtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?