JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch v. Tesla, Inc.
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09441
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that: 1. The time within which Defendant Tesla, Inc. may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including January 24, 2022; 2. The parties shall conduct their initial conference pursuant Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) on December 14, 2021. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Tesla, Inc. answer due 1/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/7/2021) (kv)
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Tesla, Inc...(Goralnik, Nathan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Pretrial Conference served on Tesla, Inc. on November 19, 2021. Service was accepted by Alex Spiro and Jonathan Pickhardt. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Cagney, Craig)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tesla, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Registered Agent. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Portnoy, Lawrence)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/17/2021) (ks)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathan Goralnik on behalf of Tesla, Inc...(Goralnik, Nathan)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse Bernstein on behalf of Tesla, Inc...(Bernstein, Jesse)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Pickhardt on behalf of Tesla, Inc...(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tesla, Inc. (vf)
November 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence Jay Portnoy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (vf)
November 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Benjamin Spiro on behalf of Tesla, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Thomas Cagney on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Cagney, Craig)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Donald Andres on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Andres, Greg)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Portnoy, Lawrence)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tesla, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Portnoy, Lawrence)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Portnoy, Lawrence)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25336577)Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch..(Portnoy, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch v. Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, London Branch
Represented By: Greg Donald Andres
Represented By: Craig Thomas Cagney
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Benjamin Spiro
Represented By: Alex Spiro
Represented By: Jesse Bernstein
Represented By: Jonathan Pickhardt
Represented By: Nathan Goralnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?