International Refugee Assistance Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: International Refugee Assistance Project
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State
Case Number: 1:2021cv09519
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Assignment, Notice of Appearance of Kathryn Austin, and Court's Individual Rules served on United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of State on 12/23/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
December 23, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; United States Department of State served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Shu-Yeng Austin on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project..(Austin, Kathryn)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/2/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/30/2021) (jca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services..(pc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State..(pc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(pc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexandra Zaretsky to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party names on the summons must exactly match what is listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexandra Zaretsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department of Homeland Security, Department of State. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
November 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariko Hirose on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project..(Hirose, Mariko)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zaretsky, Alexandra)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25347167)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Permanent Links, #2 Exhibit B - USCIS FOIA, #3 Exhibit C - State FOIA, #4 Exhibit D - State Appeal).(Zaretsky, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Refugee Assistance Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Refugee Assistance Project
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Alexandra Zaretsky
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-Yeng Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?