Donnelly et al v. Anand et al
Plaintiff: Brian Donnelly, KAWS and KAWS Inc.
Defendant: Jonathan Anand Both individually and doing business as Homeless Penthouse, Penthouse Theory, Hideout.NYC, Incognito and Young Neon, David Kang, Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi, The Penthouse Theory, The Penthouse Collective, OSell DinoDirect China Limited and Jonathan Anand individually doing business as Homeless Penthouse doing business as Penthouse Theory doing business as Hideout.NYC doing business as Incognito doing business as Young Neon
Case Number: 1:2021cv09562
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Brian D. Siff dated January 6, 2022. Time to respond to the Complaint extended to January 26, 2022. Conference is adjourned from January 21, 2022 to February 11, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi answer due 1/26/2022. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/07/2022) (ama)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (ama)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Brian D. Siff dated January 6, 2022. Document filed by Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi..(Siff, Brian)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Douglas Siff on behalf of Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi..(Siff, Brian)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, January 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749. Access Code: 3667981. Initial Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/22/2021) (ate)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Golub, Aaron)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Golub, Aaron)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Anand..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Penthouse Collective..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Penthouse Theory..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Kang..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OSell DinoDirect China Limited..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Aaron Richard Golub to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aaron Richard Golub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aaron Richard Golub. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jonathan Anand. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JONATHAN ANAND, both individually and doing business as HOMELESS PENTHOUSE, PENTHOUSE THEORY, HIDEOUT.NYC,INCOGNITO and YOUNG NEON, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID KANG, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE PENTHOUSE COLLECTIVE, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE PENTHOUSE THEORY, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DYLAN JOVAN LEONG YI ZHI, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OSELL DINODIRECT CHINA LIMITED, re: #1 Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc...(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Golub, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Anand, David Kang, Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi, OSell DinoDirect China Limited, The Penthouse Collective, The Penthouse Theory. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25353856)Document filed by Brian Donnelly, KAWS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Certificate of Registration-VA 2 -180-272, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Certificate of Registration-VA 2 - 182-652, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Trademark Certificates of Registration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4A-Homeless Penthouse's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4B- Homeless Penthouse's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale.pdf Ex. 4B- Homeless Penthouse's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale.pdf, #6 Exhibit The Penthouse Theory's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale, #7 Exhibit Incognito's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale, #8 Exhibit Hideout.NYC's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale, #9 Exhibit The Penthouse Theory's Counterfeit, Infringing Items for Sale).(Golub, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnelly et al v. Anand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Donnelly
Represented By: Aaron Richard Golub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAWS
Represented By: Aaron Richard Golub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAWS Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Richard Golub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Anand Both individually and doing business as Homeless Penthouse, Penthouse Theory, Hideout.NYC, Incognito and Young Neon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Jovan Leong Yi Zhi
Represented By: Brian Douglas Siff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Penthouse Theory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Penthouse Collective
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSell DinoDirect China Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Anand individually doing business as Homeless Penthouse doing business as Penthouse Theory doing business as Hideout.NYC doing business as Incognito doing business as Young Neon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?