Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
Defendant: United States Department of Justice and United States Marshals Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv09566
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #8 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service..(Stein, Ilan)
December 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilan Stein on behalf of United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service..(Stein, Ilan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Marshals Service served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Marshals Service..(gp)
December 13, 2021 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [Doc #16] ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. The document was incorrectly filed in this case, summons issued previously as doc #13. (gp)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Justice served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/23/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice.(jgo) Modified on 12/13/2021 (gp).
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice..(jgo)
November 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Max Roller Selver to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): refile summons request after the pleading is refiled correctly; summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Max Roller Selver to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type used (Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/24/2021. (jgo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine R. Rosenfeld on behalf of Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Roller Selver on behalf of Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Selver, Max)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25354519)Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Selver, Max) Modified on 11/19/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Max Roller Selver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Represented By: Ilan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?