Indian Harbor Insurance Company v. Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority
Counter Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority
Case Number: 1:2021cv09578
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Document filed by Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Alderdice, Jacob)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Bell on behalf of Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority..(Bell, Mark)
December 27, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for David M. Kroeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25505948. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 22, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority..(Alderdice, Jacob)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for David M. Kroeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25505948. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #3 Proposed Order).(Kroeger, David)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob D. Alderdice on behalf of Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority..(Alderdice, Jacob)
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. Service was accepted by Theodore Morrissey, General Counsel. Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company..(Margolis, Ellen)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Kish on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company..(Kish, Kristen)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority..(sj)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellen Gayle Margolis on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company..(Margolis, Ellen)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company..(Gura, Lloyd)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate X.L. America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Bermuda Ltd, Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd, Other Affiliate XL Reinsurance America, Inc. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company..(Gura, Lloyd)
November 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lloyd Andrew Gura. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gura, Lloyd)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25356244)Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company..(Gura, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indian Harbor Insurance Company v. Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Lloyd Andrew Gura
Represented By: Ellen Gayle Margolis
Represented By: Kristen Kish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Metropolitan Nashville Airport Authority
Represented By: David M. Kroeger
Represented By: Jacob D. Alderdice
Represented By: Mark Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?