Jimenez v. Bogoto Realty Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Iris Jimenez
Defendant: BOGOTO REALTY INC., The UPS Store, Inc. and Farview Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09664
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order served on Farview Inc. on January 19, 2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
January 20, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order served on The UPS Store, Inc. on January 19, 2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
January 20, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order served on Bogoto Realty Inc. on January 19, 2022. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. By January 25, 2022, Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the Court's January 13, 2022, Order and a copy of this Order on Defendants and file proof of service. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 15. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/19/2022) (ate)
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Robert G. Hanski dated January 18, 2022. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial conference scheduled for January 19, 2022 is ADJOURNED to February 23, 2022, at 4:10 p.m. By February 16, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter and proposed case management plan (see Dkt. No. 9), or Plaintiff shall file any motion for default judgment pursuant to Attachment A of the Court's Individual Rules. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants and shall file proof of service by January 18, 2022. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line: 888-363-4749, access code: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 13. Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/13/2022) (kv)
January 13, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/16/2022. (kv)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Robert G. Hanski dated January 12, 2022. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Farview Inc. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The UPS Store, Inc. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Bogoto Realty Inc. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference by telephone set for 1/19/2022 at 4:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/1/2021) (vfr)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Farview Inc.. (sj)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The UPS Store, Inc.. (sj)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bogoto Realty Inc.. (sj)
November 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Gerald Hanski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bogoto Realty Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
November 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Gerald Hanski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
November 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Farview Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The UPS Store, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bogoto Realty Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hanski, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOGOTO REALTY INC., Farview Inc., The UPS Store, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25367438)Document filed by Iris Jimenez..(Hanski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Bogoto Realty Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Jimenez
Represented By: Robert Gerald Hanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOGOTO REALTY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The UPS Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farview Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?