Neumentum, Inc. v. Ancoris Capital Partners LLC
Plaintiff: Neumentum, Inc.
Defendant: Ancoris Capital Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv09838
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference pursuant to Rule 16 is scheduled for Monday, January 31, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. At that time the parties should dial into the Court's dedicated teleconferencing line at (877) 402-9757 and enter Access Code 7938632, followed by the pound (#) key. (Initial Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/12/2022) (ras)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/11/2022) (ate)
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim. Document filed by Neumentum, Inc...(Elkin, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Neumentum, Inc.. Document filed by Ancoris Capital Partners LLC..(Davidian, Deana)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Christine Solbakken on behalf of Ancoris Capital Partners LLC..(Solbakken, Lisa)
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ancoris Capital Partners LLC..(Davidian, Deana)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deana Davidian on behalf of Ancoris Capital Partners LLC..(Davidian, Deana)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ancoris Capital Partners LLC waiver sent on 11/24/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. Document filed by Neumentum, Inc...(Elkin, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ancoris Capital Partners LLC. (sj)
November 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Lawrence Elkin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
November 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ancoris Capital Partners LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Neumentum, Inc...(Elkin, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Neumentum, Inc...(Elkin, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Elkin, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ancoris Capital Partners LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25377550)Document filed by Neumentum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advisor Agreement).(Elkin, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neumentum, Inc. v. Ancoris Capital Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neumentum, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ancoris Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Lisa Christine Solbakken
Represented By: Deana Davidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?